Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00462
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 08, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Heriberto Leal (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Kristen D. Langford-Harris
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Robert Louis Guerra
Law Office Of Robert Guerra, Pllc.
contact info
Material Witness
Gustavo Bautista-Adan
Represented By
Robert Louis Guerra
Law Office Of Robert Guerra, Pllc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corpus Christi MagDuty
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/08/2024 3:55 AM CDT
Saturday, October 05, 2024
Arrest of Heriberto Leal. (as2)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Heriberto Leal (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 10/7/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (as2)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Gustavo Bautista-Adan as to Heriberto Leal. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 10/7/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton, filed. (as2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ***VACATED BY ORDER SIGNED BY JKH 10/6/24***ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Heriberto Leal. Robert Louis Guerra appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (mwh2) Modified on 10/7/2024 (fmc2).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (mwh2)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Gustavo Bautista-Adan. Robert Louis Guerra appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (mwh2)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER VACATING ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL as to Heriberto Leal3 Order Appointing Counsel ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified. (fmc2)
Related: [-]