New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-09661
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
RENA BITTER
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT JACHIM
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN
Represented By
BROOKS E. DOYNE
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
KHZOUN ALMAKDESI
Represented By
MICHAEL Z GOLDMAN
Law Offices Of Michael Z. Goldman
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MAKDISI
Represented By
MICHAEL Z GOLDMAN
Law Offices Of Michael Z. Goldman
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Tue 05/06 10:51 AM
Letter from AUSA Brooks E. Doyne. (DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 05/05 7:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by KHZOUN ALMAKDESI, MICHAEL MAKDISI re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction With Prejudice (GOLDMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 11:16 AM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction With Prejudice . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/21 10:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction With Prejudice by All Defendants. Responses due by 5/5/2025.(DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 2:36 PM
LETTER ORDER granting defendants' request for a 21-day extension of time until 4/21/2025 to file a motion to dismiss; there will be no further extensions absent exigent circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 4/2/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Mon 03/31 7:29 PM
Letter from AUSA Brooks E. Doyne. (DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/26 3:45 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the Defendants' request for a 30-day extension of time until 3/31/2025 to file an answer or otherwise move as to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 2/26/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Mon 02/24 11:54 AM
Letter from AUSA Brooks E. Doyne. (DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 11:03 AM
LETTER ORDER granting the defendants' request for a 60-day extension of time until 2/28/2025 to file an answer or otherwise move as to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 12/19/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 12/19 11:05 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by RENA BITTER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, ROBERT JACHIM, ANTONY BLINKEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/28/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Mon 12/16 1:13 PM
Letter from AUSA Brooks E. Doyne. (DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 11/25 9:25 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney BROOKS E. DOYNE for RENA BITTER,BROOKS E. DOYNE for ANTONY BLINKEN,BROOKS E. DOYNE for ROBERT JACHIM,BROOKS E. DOYNE for ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS,BROOKS E. DOYNE for U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE,BROOKS E. DOYNE for U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN added. (DOYNE, BROOKS)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BROOKS E. DOYNE on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ROBERT JACHIM, ANTONY BLINKEN, RENA BITTER, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN, and ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS (DOYNE, BROOKS) Modified on 11/25/2024 (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 11/25 11:13 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RENA BITTER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, ROBERT JACHIM, ANTONY BLINKEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/30/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 10/21 1:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KHZOUN ALMAKDESI, MICHAEL MAKDISI. RENA BITTER served on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; ANTONY BLINKEN served on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; ROBERT JACHIM served on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN served on 10/15/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (GOLDMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 10/08 3:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RENA BITTER, ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 10/08 10:51 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by KHZOUN ALMAKDESI, MICHAEL MAKDISI as to RENA BITTER, ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN.(GOLDMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against RENA BITTER, ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT JACHIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. EMBASSY AMMAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15722996), filed by KHZOUN ALMAKDESI, MICHAEL MAKDISI.(GOLDMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/08 1:05 PM
Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams added. (ps)
Related: [-]