New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:24-cv-07612
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Davidstea (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff
Jessica Karim
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 04/02 11:06 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within sixty (60) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after sixty (60) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences and deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 04/02 11:01 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within sixty (60) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after sixty (60) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences and deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/01 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/28 11:11 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:10 Letter filed by Jessica Karim, ENDORSEMENT: The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjourned until April 7, 2025 at 10 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at (646) 453-4442 and enter conference ID# 358639322. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/28/2025) ( Initial Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (ks)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Fri 02/28 11:07 AM
ORDER re:10 Second Letter addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Gabriel A. Levy dated 2/27/25 re: Adjourn Conference filed by Jessica Karim. The Initial Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to April 7, 2025 at 2:00PM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 646-453-4442 and use Conference ID# 358639322. Parties are reminded to jointly submit, by one week prior to the conference, a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order consistent with the Court's individual practices. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/28 11:08 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Thu 02/27 9:59 AM
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Gabriel A. Levy dated 2/27/25 re: Adjourn Conference. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 order Order Wed 01/29 11:52 AM
ORDER granting8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Gabriel A. Levy dated 1/29/25 re: Adjourn Conference filed by Jessica Karim (Levy, Gabriel). The Initial Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to March 7, 2025 at 10:00AM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 646-453-4442 and use Conference ID# 358639322. Parties are reminded to jointly submit, by one week prior to the conference, a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order consistent with the Court's individual practices. No further extensions will be granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Wed 01/29 10:25 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Gabriel A. Levy dated 1/29/25 re: Adjourn Conference. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/29 11:53 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/7/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 01/23 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/6/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 646-453-4442, Conference ID# 358639322, and follow the necessary prompts. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 1/23/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 2:05 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Davidstea (USA), Inc. served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Davidstea (USA), Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 10/09 9:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 10/09 9:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 10/09 9:38 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Tue 10/08 12:27 PM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Davidstea (USA), Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/08 12:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Davidstea (USA), Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30009175)Document filed by Jessica Karim..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]