New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:24-cv-07620
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:17 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Prime Hydration, LLC
Represented By
Barry R. Horwitz
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Justin Albano MacLean
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Herbert Finn
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mark Anthony Brands International Unlimited Company
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mark Anthony International SRL
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mas+ Next Generation Beverage Co.
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Prime Hydration, LLC
Represented By
Barry R. Horwitz
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Justin Albano MacLean
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Herbert Finn
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Cross Defendant
Lionel Messi
Represented By
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Prime Hydration, LLC
Represented By
Barry R. Horwitz
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Katie Cronin
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Justin Albano MacLean
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Herbert Finn
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Anthony Brands International Unlimited Company
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Anthony International SRL
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mas+ Next Generation Beverage Co.
Represented By
Jyotin Hamid
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jacob Hochberger
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
David H. Bernstein
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Megan Bannigan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Timothy Joseph Cuffman
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
67 67 answer Answer to Amended Counterclaim Answer to Complaint Thu 04/10 11:50 PM
ANSWER to60 Amended Counterclaim,., ANSWER to60 Amended Counterclaim,. Document filed by Bolvir, LLC, LMGM, SLU, Mark Anthony Brands International Unlimited Company, Mark Anthony International SRL, Mas+ Next Generation Beverage Co., Lionel Messi..(Bernstein, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
66 66 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bolvir, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
65 65 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LMGM, SLU..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 04/07 3:27 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Bolvir, LLC, LMGM, SLU added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,.Document filed by Bolvir, LLC. Related document:1 Complaint,..(MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]