Texas Northern District Court
Judge:A Joe Fish
Case #: 3:24-cv-02530
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 4:43 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Johnathan Delcambre
Represented By
Ian Bernard Salzer
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary PLLC
contact info
Sawnie A McEntire
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary PLLC
contact info
Roger L McCleary
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary & Clark, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Humphreys & Partners Architects LP
Represented By
Timothy M Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Bradley Timms
Brackett & Ellis PC
contact info
Richard E Schellhammer
Underwood Law Firm PC
contact info
Defendant
Johnathan Delcambre
Represented By
Ian Bernard Salzer
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary PLLC
contact info
Sawnie A McEntire
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary PLLC
contact info
Roger L McCleary
Parsons Mcentire Mccleary & Clark, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
HPA & Partners (Viet Nam) Design Company Limited
Defendant
Nguyen Thanh Huyen
Defendant
Nguyen Viet Thang
Defendant
Pham Duc Tue
Defendant
Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc
Represented By
Gabriel Canto
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Michele Billera Focht
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Humphreys & Partners Architects LP
Represented By
Timothy M Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Bradley Timms
Brackett & Ellis PC
contact info
Richard E Schellhammer
Underwood Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/07 10:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 9/8/2026 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 7/25/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2025. Motions due by 3/2/2026. Discovery due by 4/1/2026. Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2026. Pretrial Materials due by 8/28/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2026 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Status Report due by 2/2/2026. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/7/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Correct Party Name. The court ORDERS that Jonathan Delcambre is hereby substituted for the defendant Johnathan Delcambre. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/5/2025) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 3:45 PM
MOTION TO CORRECT PARTY NAME filed by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
24 24 order Order Wed 04/30 4:49 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: To date, the parties have failed to comply with the court's order to "stipulate to or move to substitute or correct party name no later than April 28, 2025." See 22 Status Report Order at n.*. By May 2, 2025, the parties shall comply with this order. See id. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/30/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 discov Joint Submission on Discovery Matters Mon 04/28 4:51 PM
First Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc. (Focht, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
22 22 order Status Report Order Tue 04/08 9:15 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2025. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/7/2025) (kaf)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/07 3:24 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Dismiss. Party Nguyen Viet Thang, Pham Duc Tue, HPA & Partners (Viet Nam) Design Company Limited and Nguyen Thanh Huyen terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/7/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 04/07 8:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Claims Against HPA Design & Partners (Viet Nam) Company Limited d/b/a HPA + BKV Vietnam, Nguyen Viet Thang, Pham Duc Tue, and Nguyen Thanh Huyen filed by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion to Vacate Thu 02/27 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The18 unopposed motion of the defendant/counter-plaintiff Jonathan Delcambre, incorrectly named as Johnathan Delcambre, to vacate the court's electronic order of February 21, 2025 (docket entry 14 ) is GRANTED, and the order is hereby VACATED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/27/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Vacate Thu 02/27 3:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 14 Order,, or Extend Deadline filed by Johnathan Delcambre (McCleary, Roger)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 02/24 9:57 AM
ORDER: The plaintiff shall have until 4/7/2025, to serve the defendants (1) HPA Design & Partners (Viet Nam) Company Limited d/b/a HPA + BKV Vietnam, (2) Nguyen Viet Thang, (3) Pham Duc Tue, and (4) Nguyen Thanh Huyen. If no service is effected by this date, the claims against these defendants will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/24/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Fri 02/21 11:10 AM
STATUS REPORT CONCERNING SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP. (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 02/21 10:20 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP. Related document:12 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Fri 02/21 9:49 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Although the plaintiff/counter-defendant Humphreys & Partners Architects, L.P. ("HPA") is in default, the defendant/counter-plaintiff Jonathan Delcambre ("Delcambre"), incorrectly named as Johnathan Delcambre, has failed to move for entry of default and a default judgment. Unless Delcambre moves for such relief by March 3, 2025, his counterclaims against HPA will be dismissed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/21/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 09, 2025
13 13 order Order Sun 02/09 3:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: It appears to the court that more than 122 days have elapsed since the filing of the plaintiff's complaint and that service on the defendants (1) HPA Design & Partners (Viet Nam) Company Limited d/b/a HPA + BKV Vietnam, (2) Nguyen Viet Thang, (3) Pham Duc Tue, and (4) Nguyen Thanh Huyen in this case has not yet been accomplished. Unless the plaintiff shows cause in writing by February 20, 2025, why its claims against these defendants should be retained on the docket, they will be dismissed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/9/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 01/23 4:46 PM
First Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Johnathan Delcambre. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Humphreys & Partners Architects LP filed by Johnathan Delcambre (Salzer, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 5:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnathan Delcambre. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Salzer, Ian)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Mon 01/06 9:20 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: On January 3, 2025, the defendant Jonathan Delcambre ("Delcambre"), incorrectly named as Johnathan Delcambre, filed an answer in this case but did not provide the Clerk of Court with a certificate of interested persons. N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 7.4 requires that "[t]he initial responsive pleading or motion filed in lieu of a responsive pleading that a defendant files in a civil action must be accompanied by a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the defendant concurs in the accuracy of another party's previously-filed certificate, the defendant may adopt that certificate." Accordingly, no later than January 13, 2025, Delcambre must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. Failure to do so may result in the entry of default judgment without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/6/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/03 6:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Johnathan Delcambre. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Roger L McCleary added to party Johnathan Delcambre(pty:dft) (McCleary, Roger)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 1:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Canto, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 1:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gabriel Canto added to party Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc(pty:dft) (Canto, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 10/15 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Tue 10/15 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 3.1 provides that "[t]he complaint must be accompanied by... a separately signed certificate of interested persons -- in a form approved by the clerk -- that contains -- in addition to the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) -- a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than October 21, 2024, the plaintiff must comply with this rule. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 10/15/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Boarman Kroos Vogel Group Inc, Johnathan Delcambre, HPA & Partners (Viet Nam) Design Company Limited, Nguyen Thanh Huyen, Nguyen Viet Thang, Pham Duc Tue. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
3 3 1 pgs misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Wed 10/09 9:25 AM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Additional Page(s)
2 2 qcref Fish Wed 10/09 9:15 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 12:12 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Boarman Kroos Vogel Group, Inc., Johnathan Delcambre, HPA & Partners (Viet Nam) Design Company Limited, Nguyen Thanh Huyen, Nguyen Viet Thang, Pham Duc Tue filed by Humphreys & Partners Architects LP. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14975450) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet