California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02141
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 1:59 AM PDT
Defendant
First Entertainment Credit Union
Represented By
Mark Kenneth Worthge
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Perez
Represented By
Joseph Brian Angelo
Gale Angelo And Johnson P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/29 12:50 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed April 28, 2025 (Dkt. No. 17 ), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By May 29, 2025, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of May 30, 2025. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 notice Settlement Mon 04/28 9:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (with Defendant First Entertainment Credit Union) filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Thu 03/20 10:30 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/20/2025. (mga)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 03/20 10:29 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 6/23/2025. Discovery cut-off 9/22/2025. Motions cut-off 12/2/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/14/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2026 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2026 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/20 10:28 PM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2025. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 03/12 7:36 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-2 days, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez..(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pretrial and Trial Worksheet
Sunday, February 09, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Sun 02/09 11:10 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/05 11:53 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 12/02 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:24-cv-02141 JGB(DTBx). (rn)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/27 6:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant, First Entertainment Credit Union First Entertainment Credit Union.(Worthge, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/15 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendant First Entertainment Credit Union, identifying First Entertainment Credit Union. (Worthge, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/15 4:05 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)6 filed by Attorneys for Specially Appearing Defendant First Entertainment Credit Union First Entertainment Credit Union.(Attorney Mark Kenneth Worthge added to party First Entertainment Credit Union(pty:dft))(Worthge, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/08 3:50 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant First Entertainment Credit Union. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Tue 10/08 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C Statement of Consent
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 10/08 11:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 10/08 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez, (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 10/08 11:48 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez. (Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/08 11:48 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38359878 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Perez. (Attorney Joseph Brian Angelo added to party Joseph Perez(pty:pla))(Angelo, Joseph)
Related: [-]