Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-13056

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:24-ap-01232
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steven Eric Winger
6395 Lake Gulch Road
Castle Rock, CO 80104
Represented By
Steven Eric Winger
contact info
Plaintiff
Kapitus Servicing Inc.
Represented By
Scott K. Brown, II
Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
20 20 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Mon 05/05 3:44 PM
Minutes of Proceeding: The Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Answer (ECF #18) is GRANTED. The Defendant shall refile his Answer in this adversary proceeding by May 16, 2025. This matter is continued to Tuesday, May 27, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. The telephone number and all other relevant information is available on the Courts website at https://www.cob.uscourts.gov/content/judge-michael-e-romero-mer. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/27/2025 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for15 . Document due by 5/16/2025 for15 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, April 28, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/28 11:38 AM
Status Report Filed by Scott K. Brown II on behalf of Kapitus Servicing Inc. Related [+]. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 motion Motion Wed 04/23 2:03 PM
Motion to Strike Defendant's Answer Filed by Scott K. Brown II on behalf of Kapitus Servicing Inc. Related [+]. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-] 14 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Wed 04/16 10:41 AM
Notice Re: Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement. Filed by Scott K. Brown II on behalf of Kapitus Servicing Inc.. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/10 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 order Set Hearing (Bankruptcy) Tue 04/08 3:14 PM
Order Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 5/5/2025 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for14 . Document due by 4/28/2025 for1 and14 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,14 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/02 12:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven Eric Winger Related [+]. (dmu) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2025 (dmu)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, February 01, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/01 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Thursday, January 30, 2025
12 12 order Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 01/30 1:46 PM
Order Related [+]. Document due by 2/28/2025 for11 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Extend Time
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 01/27 3:39 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Steven Eric Winger. (dmu)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12/29 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Friday, December 27, 2024
9 9 order Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 12/27 2:02 PM
Order Extending Deadline Related [+]. Document due by 1/27/2025 for8 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Extend Time
Monday, December 23, 2024
8 8 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 12/23 5:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Steven Eric Winger Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Saturday, November 09, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/09 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 order Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 11/07 2:06 PM
Order Related [+]. Document due by 12/23/2024 for5 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 11/07 10:56 AM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Steven Eric Winger. (dmu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 10/09 4:40 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Steven Eric Winger and Nicholas Craig Horvath on October 8, 2024 Filed by Scott K. Brown II on behalf of Kapitus Servicing Inc.. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Tue 10/08 4:05 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Corporate Parents Added to Case: Strategic Funding Source, Inc. d/b/a Kapitus. Filed by Scott K. Brown II on behalf of Kapitus Servicing Inc.. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 10/07 4:45 PM
Summons Issued on Steven Eric Winger Answer Due 11/6/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/07 4:41 PM
Adversary case 24-01232 Complaint by Kapitus Servicing Inc. against Steven Eric Winger. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 01/6/2025 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Brown, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A and B