Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-11843

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-ap-01134
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pedro Antonio Sanchez
7000 La Palma Ave. H206
Buena Park, CA 90620
Represented By
Pedro Antonio Sanchez
contact info
Plaintiff
Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
11665 Coley River Cir.
Fountain Valley, CA 92708
Represented By
Christopher J Green
Palmieri Tyler
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
18 18 misc Declaration Tue 05/20 5:00 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Christopher Green In Support of Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc. Related [+]. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 Status report
17 17 misc Status report Tue 05/20 4:57 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc. Related [+]. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 04/30 4:05 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc. Default Judgment Motion due by 05/30/2025. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Diana Beiza
Att: 2 Declaration of Christopher J. Green
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Att: 4 Exhibit B
Att: 5 Exhibit C
Att: 6 Exhibit D
Att: 7 Exhibit E
Att: 8 Exhibit F
Att: 9 Exhibit G
Att: 10 Exhibit H
Att: 11 Exhibit I
Saturday, April 19, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 04/19 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 17, 2025
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 04/17 1:26 PM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order Pursuant To LBR 7016-1(a)(4). IT IS ORDERED: The Matter Is Disposed Of As Follows: CONTINUED To The Following Date For A Further STATUS CONFERENCE: JUNE 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. A Joint Status Report Must Be Filed And Served, Including A Judge's Copy, By: May 20, 2025. Plaintiff Is To Request Entry Of Default By No Later Than: March 25, 2025. Plaintiff Is To File A Motion For Default Judgment By No Later Than: April 30, 2025. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/17/2025. (NB8)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 03/20 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Tue 03/18 5:18 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Pedro Sanchez Related [+] (NB8)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Mon 03/17 4:12 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Pedro Sanchez Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Tue 03/25 8:07 AM
Hearing Continued On Status Conference Related [+] - STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO JUNE 3, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701. STATUS REPORT DUE FOURTEEN (14) DAYS IN ADVANCE.. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Determine Debts Nondischargeable Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 523filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 misc Status report Tue 02/25 5:06 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc. Related [+]. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher J. Green in Support of Plaintiffs Unilateral Status Report
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 01/16 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 01/14 10:35 AM
Status Conference And Scheduling Order Pursuant To LBR 7016-1(a)(4). IT IS ORDERED: The STATUS CONFERENCE Is CONTINUED To The Following Date For A Further Status Conference: MARCH 11, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. A Joint Status Report Must Be Filed And Served, Including A Judge's Copy, By: February 25, 2025. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/14/2025. (NB8)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Tue 01/14 10:06 AM
Notice of Attorney Change of Address or Law Firm Filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.. (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 01/13 3:38 PM
Hearing Continued On Status Conference Related [+] - STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO MARCH 11, 2025 AT 1:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 5C, LOCATED AT 411 WEST FOURTH STREET, SANTA ANA, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint To Determine Debts Nondischargeable Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 523filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/09 4:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pedro Antonio Sanchez 10/9/2024; Karen S Naylor (TR) 10/9/2024; Pedro Sanchez 10/9/2024; United States Trustee (SA) 10/9/2024 (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/09 8:50 AM
Summons Issued on Pedro Sanchez Date Issued 10/9/2024, Answer Due 11/8/2024 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 1/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 10/09 8:47 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect plaintiff/defendant/attorney/party information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Omni Metal Finishing, Inc.
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 9:14 AM
Adversary case 8:24-ap-01134. Complaint by Omni Metal Finishing, Inc. against Pedro Antonio Sanchez. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Green, Christopher)
Related: [-]