Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: John D Love
Case #: 6:24-cv-00376
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Dallas Regional Medical Center Mesquite Texas
Plaintiff
Larrie Jane Hoops
24534 CR 343
Tyler, TX 75708


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Wed 10/23 11:20 AM
Mail sent to Larrie Jane Hoops returned as undeliverable containing a docket sheet. (jbe)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 10/23 11:01 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt on 10/21/24 as to6 Return of Service Executed. (jbe)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Mon 10/21 4:31 PM
Return of Service Executed (jbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/10 11:18 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/9/24. (jbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/08 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Dallas Regional Medical Center Mesquite Texas. (wea)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/08 4:25 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (wea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Dallas Regional Medical Center Mesquite Texas, filed by Larrie Jane Hoops.(wea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Power of Attorney,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/08 4:22 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 6-68035 (wea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 10/08 4:26 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (wea)
Related: [-]