California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02769
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 1:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Associated Students, Incorporated
Represented By
Alec David Tyra
Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard
contact info
David W. Tyra
Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Luke Wood
Represented By
Alec David Tyra
Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard
contact info
David W. Tyra
Kronick, Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard
contact info
Plaintiff
Josiah Malchiel Israel Ben-Oni
2646 Squaw Valley Way
Sacramento, CA 95826

GPO Oct 11 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 10/11/2024 DENYING 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; DENYING 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; REFERRING this matter to the assigned Magistrate Judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Michel, G.)
GPO Nov 04 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/04/2024 GRANTING 9 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due on or before 12/06/24. (Lopez, K)
GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/7/2024 GRANTING 12 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time. Response due by 12/6/2024. (Kyono, V)
GPO Nov 18 2024
mplaint within 14 days of the Order. (Mendez Licea, O)ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/18/2024 DENYING 16 Motion for Electronic Filing, DENYING 15 & 18 Motion for Reconsideration and GRANTING 21 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Co

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
56 56 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/05 4:30 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 2009 Johnson Drive, Antioch, CA 94509 and NOTICE re plaintiff not receiving54 Order and REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Josiah Malchiel Israel Ben-Oni. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
55 55 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/05 4:24 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Associated Students, Incorporated, Jonathan Luke Wood by Josiah Malchiel Israel Ben-Oni. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]