California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-04123
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2024 12:24 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Krayton Lee Bodner (1)
Terminated: 07/11/2024
Represented By
Jelani J. Lindsey
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2024 1:36 AM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
Notice to District of Oregon of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner. Your case number is: 1:14cr328. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:10 Warrant of Removal and Commitment to Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Krayton Lee Bodner, originating in the District of Oregon. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3583. Signed by agent Stellern, USMS, DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner; defendants Year of Birth: 1980; date of arrest: 7/10/2024 USMS# REG 76702-065 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner. Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Jelani J. Lindsey for Krayton Lee Bodner, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court orders defendant held to answer to District of Oregon on 7/29/24 at 3:00 pm. Warrant of Removal and final commitment to issue. Court Smart: CS 7/11/24. (mhe)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of Oregon at Medford.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
7 7 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner. (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi that Defendant Krayton Lee Bodner be removed to the District of Oregon (mhe)
Related: [-]