California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:24-cv-01799
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Eric J. Topol
Defendant
Steven R. Altman
Defendant
Nick Augustinos
Defendant
Richard A. Collins
Defendant
Karen Dahut
Defendant
Dexcom Inc.
Defendant
Rimma Driscoll
Defendant
Mark G. Foletta
Defendant
Bridgette P. Heller
Defendant
Barbara E. Kahn
Defendant
Kyle Malady
Defendant
Jereme M. Sylvain
Defendant
Kevin R. Sayer
Plaintiff
Jerome Malone
Represented By
Robert C Moest
Law Offices Of Robert C Moest
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Consolidation Order Tue 12/17 9:25 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Cases Consolidated, 24-cv-01645-RSH-VET. All future docketing will be done in the lead case.. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 12/16/2024.(stn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number Rule Mon 10/28 2:34 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE, re4 Notice of Related Case. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert S. Huie and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:24-cv-01485-RSH-VET. The new case number is 24-cv-01799-RSH-VET. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/10/2024. Signed by Judge Robert S. Huie on 10/10/2024.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/10 10:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome Malone. Dexcom Inc. served. (Moest, Robert) (mjw)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Related Case Thu 10/10 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) of case(s) 24-cv-01485-RSH-VET. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
3 3 misc Supplemental Document Tue 10/08 8:25 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Jerome Malone re1 Complaint,, (inadvertently omitted verification) . (Moest, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/08 12:59 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/08 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Steven R. Altman, Nick Augustinos, Richard A. Collins, Karen Dahut, Dexcom Inc., Rimma Driscoll, Mark G. Foletta, Bridgette P. Heller, Barbara E. Kahn, Kyle Malady, Kevin R. Sayer, Jereme M. Sylvain, Eric J. Topol ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19247088.), filed by Jerome Malone. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1799-H-MSB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Moest, Robert)(jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet