Original Case: 0:23-cv-03614

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03042
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 09, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Cinema Entertainment Corporation
Represented By
Joel C. Griswold
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Alexander T. Mastellar
RINKE & NOONAN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gina Christopherson, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated
Represented By
Caroline Heicklen Brunkow
FORSGREN & FISHER
contact info
Ben Hutman
SADIS & GOLDBERG
contact info
Matthew D. Forsgren
FORSGREN & FISHER
contact info
Scott Ferrier
SADIS & GOLDBERG
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2024 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5443764] 24-3042 (ASL)
Related: [-]
29 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 10/7/2024, Order filed 9/17/2024, Judgment filed 9/17/2024, and docket entries, [5443771] 24-3042 (ASL)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 11/18/2024. Appendix due 11/26/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Gina Christopherson due 11/26/2024
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5443775] 24-3042 (ASL)
Related: [-]