Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:24-bk-22148

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 7:24-ap-07034
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mortgage Assets Management, LLC
3333 Camino del Rio South Suite 225
San Diego, CA 92108
Represented By
Mortgage Assets Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
PHH Mortgage
3333 Camino del Rio South Suite 225
San Diego, CA 92108
Represented By
PHH Mortgage
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanna Verrino
37 Capt. Honeywells Road
Ardsley, NY 10502
Represented By
Anne J. Penachio
Penachio Malara LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/15 11:10 AM
Scheduling Order signed on 4/15/2025. (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Wed 04/09 3:46 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Pre-Trial Conference held and adjourned to 7/9/2025 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 03/13 6:17 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre Trial Conference; Hearing Held And Adjourned To: 04/09/2025 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM). (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Thu 03/06 10:56 PM
Please take notice that any and all hearings currently scheduled to be held on March 12, 2025 have been moved to 10 AM. (Fredericks, Frances)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Wed 01/15 3:20 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pre Trial Conference; hearing held and adjourned to 3/12/2025 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 12/05 11:05 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre-trial Conference; Hearing Held And Adjourned To: 01/15/2025 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM). (Mercado, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
4 4 answer None Thu 11/14 4:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Leah N. Jacob on behalf of PHH Mortgage. (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 10/23 10:39 AM
Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint Related [+] Filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Joanna Verrino. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 10/15 10:02 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/4/2024 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM), Answer due by 11/14/2024, (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 10/08 1:33 PM
Adversary case 24-07034 Complaint against Mortgage Assets Management, LLC, PHH Mortgage (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Joanna Verrino. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proof of Claim numbered 6 of Mortgage Assets Management LLC c/o PHH Mortgage
Att: 2 Exhibit B Schedule of Advances