California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:24-bk-51531
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
LPG 405 ALBERTO WAY RESIDENTIAL, LLC, DEBTOR
401-409 ALBERTO WAY
SANTA CLARA, CA 95030
Represented By
William M. Noall
Garman Turner Gordon
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
152 152 audio audio Thu 05/15 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 5/15/2025 10:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 1888 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:52 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 05/15 10:12 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. Appearances: Talitha Gray Kozlowski on behalf of the debtor, Jennifer Crastz for Stearns Bank, and Blair Will for RS Lending. The status conference is continued to 6/25/25 at 10:00 a.m. (acr)
Related: [-] 11 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 05/15 10:13 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. The confirmation hearing is continued is to 6/25/25 at 10:00 a.m. subject to adequate protection payments as outlined in the stipulation by the parties.(acr)
Related: [-] 99 Order Approving Disclosure Statement
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 05/15 10:13 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in/via San Jose Courtroom 11 - Hammond. (acr)
Related: [-] 140 Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
151 151 4 pgs misc Declaration Wed 05/14 10:15 PM
Declaration of Randolph Lamb Regarding May 15, 2025 Hearings Related [+]. Filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC (Gray Kozlowski, Talitha)
Related: [-] 123 Amended Chapter 11 Plan
150 150 3 pgs order Stipulation Wed 05/14 1:21 PM
Order Approving Stipulation With Stearns Bank National Association Related [+]. (acr)
Related: [-] 149 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC
court Hearing Dropped Wed 05/14 1:39 PM
Hearing Dropped Related [+]. Dropped from calendar pursuant to the stipulation and order entered on the docket 5/13-5/14/25. (acr)
Related: [-] 113 Objection to Claim
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
149 149 4 pgs stip Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/13 2:57 PM
Stipulation, Stipulation with Stearns Bank National Association Filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC Related [+]. (Noall, William)
Related: [-] 113 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC,131 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Requestor Stearns Bank National Association
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1
Friday, May 09, 2025
148 148 2 pgs order Stipulation Fri 05/09 11:13 AM
Order Approving Stipulation With Stearns Bank National Association To Continue Briefing Deadlines Related [+]. (acr)
Related: [-] 147 Stipulation for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC
147 147 2 pgs stip Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 8:22 AM
Stipulation, Stipulation with Stearns Bank National Association to Continue Briefing Deadlines Filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC Related [+]. (Gray Kozlowski, Talitha)
Related: [-] 113 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor LPG 405 Alberto Way Residential, LLC