New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:24-cv-09684
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY
Represented By
KEVIN JOSEPH O'CONNOR
Peckar & Abramson, PC
contact info
Defendant
PINK PERSONALITY INC.
Represented By
KEVIN JOSEPH O'CONNOR
Peckar & Abramson, PC
contact info
Defendant
PEDRO VELAZQUEZ
Notice Only
PHV JUDD BURSTEIN
Plaintiff
TAMEER PEAK
650 HUNTERDON STREET
NEWARK, NJ 07108


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/20 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LUISA M. FLOREZ on behalf of ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC. (FLOREZ, LUISA)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/20 10:40 AM
LETTER ORDER granting31 Defendant's request for the Initial Conference to be adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/20/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
31 31 misc Letter Mon 05/19 3:02 PM
Letter from Kevin J. O'Connor, Esq.. (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
30 30 5 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/14 4:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by TAMEER PEAK re24 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Transfer(adc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit H
Monday, March 10, 2025
29 29 21 pgs respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 6:07 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC. re24 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Transfer (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 misc Exhibit Index Tue 03/04 1:02 PM
Index of Exhibits filed by TAMEER PEAK (adc, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
27 27 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Tue 03/04 12:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition filed by TAMEER PEAK re24 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Transfer (adc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/25 11:28 AM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Transfer . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 3:08 PM
LETTER ORDER re Dkt No.25 ; that by way of background, the initial conference in this matter was adjourned in light of Defendants Onika Maraj-Petty and Pink Personality Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Transfer [see Dkt. No. 24]. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/24/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 02/20 4:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Transfer by ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC..(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Declaration of Judd Burstein in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Sunday, February 16, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Mon 02/24 12:56 PM
Letter to Judge Martinotti from TAMEER PEAK. Related [+](adc, ) Modified on 2/24/2025 (adc, )
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 02/11 8:58 AM
LETTER ORDER adjourning 3/6/2025 Initial Conference to 6/5/2025 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/10/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/03 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by KEVIN JOSEPH O'CONNOR (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Wed 01/22 1:50 PM
Letter in Opposition from TAMEER PEAK re19 Letter. (adc)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Text Order Tue 01/21 2:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter having come before the Court in accordance with the Court's judicial preferences by defendants having filed a premotion submission (ECF No. 19), and the Court having determined a premotion conference would not be beneficial, the parties shall proceed with motion practice in accordance with the rules of Court. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 01/21/2025. (lr, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 01/21 9:39 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, JUDD BURSTEIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
19 19 3 pgs misc Letter Mon 01/20 3:06 PM
Letter from Defendants seeking leave to bring motion to dismiss. (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 01/17 12:06 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Judd Burstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Thu 01/16 10:34 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to JUDD BURSTEIN: $ 250, receipt number TRE142179 (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/13 4:54 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Judd Burstein, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/13/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 8:40 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Judd Burstein, Esq. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
utility Motions Referred Thu 01/09 4:02 PM
16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Judd Burstein, Esq. REFERRED to James B. Clark. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/08 5:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Judd Burstein, Esq. by ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC..(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Kevin J. O'Connor in Support of Motion to Admit Judd Burstein, Esq. Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 4 pgs Declaration of Judd Burstein in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit A to J.Burstein Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to J.Burstein Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to J.Burstein Declaration,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
utility Motions Referred Thu 01/02 8:48 AM
15 MOTION REFERRED to James B. Clark. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/31 9:01 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/31/2024. (seb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/31 11:39 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/31 11:28 AM
MOTION for alternative service of process on Defendant PEDRO VELAZQUEZ by TAMEER PEAK.(adc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
13 13 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Thu 12/26 4:28 PM
REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS'11 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS. by TAMEER PEAK (ld) Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 12/24 4:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC.. (O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
11 11 13 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/24 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC..(O'CONNOR, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/13 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAMEER PEAK. ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY served on 12/3/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (ld)(ECF Help Desk Email)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/13 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAMEER PEAK. PINK PERSONALITY INC. served on 12/3/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (ld)(ECF Help Desk Email)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/18 2:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC., PEDRO VELAZQUEZ, filed by Plaintiff, TAMEER PEAK.(jd, ) Related [+] Modified on 10/18/2024 (jd, )
Related: [-] ceived via the help desk email.
6 6 misc Letter Fri 10/18 2:53 PM
Letter from TAMEER PEAK. Related [+] (jd, )
Related: [-] ceived via the help desk email.
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 10/16 5:15 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC., PEDRO VELAZQUEZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 5:01 PM
ORDER Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint sufficiently setting forth the basis of this Court's Jurisdiction, by 10/30/2024. Failure to do so will result in dismissal. Plaintiff shall advise the Court of cases he previously filed against any of the named defendants by filing a letter with the Court listing case names, docket numbers, and presiding Judges. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/16/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by Plaintiff, TAMEER PEAK. (jd, )
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/15 2:27 PM
Filing fee: $405.00, receipt number NEW50948. (ps)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT see1 against ONIKA TANYA MARAJ-PETTY, PINK PERSONALITY INC., PEDRO VELAZQUEZ with JURY DEMAND, filed by TAMEER PEAK.(jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Wed 10/09 3:36 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (and)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Wed 10/09 3:35 PM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (and)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs service Complaint Received Wed 10/09 3:25 PM
Complaint Received. (and)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons - 1 of 3,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons - 2 of 3,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons - 3 of 3