Arizona District Court
Judge:Rosemary Marquez
Case #: 4:24-cv-00499
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Pima County Superior Court, C20244138
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 1:26 AM MST
Defendant
STLC Europe Twenty Five Leasing Limited
Defendant
Blafugl EHF
Represented By
Ryan D Pont
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Foster Robberson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated
Represented By
Joel Louis Herz
Law Offices Of Joel L Herz
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
21 21 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/13 7:41 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Request for Open Extension of Time to Serve STLC Europe Twenty-Five Leasing Limited (Doc. 1-4 at 2-5) is granted , as set forth. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc.10 ) is denied . Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadlines in Proposed Scheduling Order (Doc.17 ) is partially granted to the extent this Order provides the relief requested and is otherwise denied as moot . The above-entitled action is stayed pending further Order of this Court. Within fourteen (14) days from the date this Order is filed, and every sixty (60) days thereafter, the parties shall file a status report regarding the status of GTLK Europe DAC's bankruptcy proceeding in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Arizona. (See attached Order for complete details) Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 5/12/2025. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
20 20 misc Reply Fri 03/21 1:13 PM
REPLY re:17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines) by Defendant Blafugl EHF.(Robberson, Foster)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/14 2:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated.(Herz, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Deanna Hackney
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 misc Notice of Errata Wed 03/12 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Errata re:17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Blafugl EHF..(Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 5
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/12 8:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Blafugl EHF.(Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 2:27 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Filing of Scheduling Order by Blafugl EHF .(Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/02 2:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated. (Herz, Joel)
Related: [-]
14 14 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 12:27 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Blafugl EHF. (Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 misc Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant Mon 11/25 4:31 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Blafugl EHF. (Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/22 10:52 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blafugl EHF.(Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Attachment
Monday, November 11, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/11 12:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blafugl EHF.(Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 motion Remand to State Court Fri 11/08 8:45 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated.(Herz, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
9 9 misc Reply Tue 10/22 10:19 AM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OPEN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT STLC EUROPE TWENTY FIVE LEASING LIMITED by Plaintiff Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated.(Herz, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B,
Att: 2 Exhibit C-D
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 10/21 9:05 AM
Disclosure Statement by Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Marana Holdco Incorporated for Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated. (Herz, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
7 7 misc Response Thu 10/17 12:59 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Open Extension of Time to Serve Defendant STLC Europe Twenty-Five Leasing Limited by Defendant Blafugl EHF. (Robberson, Foster)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 10/15 12:41 PM
Disclosure Statement by Blafugl EHF. (Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 misc Supplement Wed 10/09 2:56 PM
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet re: 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only),, by Defendant Blfugl EHF. (Pont, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Wed 10/09 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Blfugl EHF. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new removal case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Wed 10/09 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Blfugl EHF, Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated. (BAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Wed 10/09 2:10 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23550004. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-00499 TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/09 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20244138. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23550004 filed by Blfugl EHF. (Pont, Ryan)(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C