Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04043
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Jordan Micka
Represented By
Jolene Sarah Griffith
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Patrick Mahoney
Represented By
Elizabeth L Moyo
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jordan Micka
23201 South Verbena St.
Kennewick, WA 99337
Represented By
Jolene Sarah Griffith
Bailey Cavalieri LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michele Micka
23201 S Verbena Prairie SE
Kennewick, WA 99337
Mediator
Christopher Jones
Represented By
Christopher Jones
Calfee Halter & Griswold LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Mahoney
5727 Rocky Shore Dr.
Lewis Center, OH 43035
Represented By
Elizabeth L Moyo
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 order Order Thu 05/08 11:28 AM
NOTATION ORDER - The parties represent that they will be able to dismiss this action within 30 days. (Doc. 30 ). As such, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before 6/9/2025, unless the case is dismissed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/8/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
14 14 misc Status Report Wed 05/07 3:24 PM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Patrick Mahoney. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/07 10:34 AM
NOTATION ORDER -The parties continue to negotiate the language of their settlement agreement (Doc.12 ). As such, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint status report on or before 5/7/2025, unless a dismissal is filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/7/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 04/04 6:08 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiff Patrick Mahoney. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 order Order Tue 02/18 10:27 AM
NOTATION ORDER - The parties continue to revise their settlement agreement. (Doc.10 ). As such, they are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before 4/4/2025, unless a dismissal is filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/18/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 02/14 9:49 AM
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Patrick Mahoney. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Fri 02/14 9:12 AM
NOTATION ORDER - On January 14, 2025, the parties reported this matter was settled. (Doc. 8). As such, the Court ordered them to file a joint status report on or before 2/13/2025, unless the case was dismissed before that date. (Doc. 8). The parties missed that deadline. Therefore, they are ORDERED to comply with the Court's previous order, (Doc. 8), on or before 2/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/14/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 order Order Tue 01/14 11:20 AM
NOTATION ORDER - The parties report that this matter is settled. As such, the Court VACATES the deadlines for the parties' Rule 26(f) report, (Doc. 6 ), and Plaintiff's response to the counterclaim, (Doc.7 ). The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before 2/13/2025, unless a dismissal is filed before that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/14/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 12/27 9:24 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Patrick Mahoney, Counter Defendant Patrick Mahoney. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/26 3:07 PM
NOTATION ORDER: In light of the parties' mediation report (Doc. 5 ), the parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26(f) Report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/26/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 12/09 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand and , COUNTERCLAIM against Patrick Mahoney filed by Jordan Micka. (Griffith, Jolene)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
3 3 med Notice Setting Mediation Mon 11/18 3:55 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Christopher Jones to conduct mediation in 41 South High Street, Suite 1200, Columbus, Ohio 43215. Mediation Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 09:00 AM. (Jones, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
med Notice Designating Mediator Fri 11/15 9:42 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: The parties have requested early mediation. Christopher Jones assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation as soon as practicable, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/18 1:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jordan Micka on 10/9/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/09 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10201200), filed by Patrick Mahoney. (Moyo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet