Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:24-cv-05415
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
CAPTECH CONSULTING
Defendant
CAPTECH VENTURES, INC.
Represented By
Vincent M Silvanio
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
RENEE N. SMITH
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
TRACEY PAVLICIN
Represented By
LANE SCHIFF
Console Mattiacci Law, LLC
contact info
Unrepresented Party
CAPTECH CONSULTING
676 SWEDESFORD ROAD SUITE 110
WAYNE, PA 19087


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/19 3:39 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MAY ENTER INTO A PRIVATE AGREEMENT TO MAINTAIN CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS AND TO SUBMIT CLAIMS OF BREACH OF THEIR PRIVATE CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/19/25. 5/19/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/19 12:07 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/29/25 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3C BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 5/19/25. 5/19/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
21 21 3 pgs motion Order Fri 05/16 1:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Order for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order filed by CAPTECH VENTURES, INC...(SMITH, RENEE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 11:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/2/25 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/27/25. DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, ARE DUE BY 7/18/25. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/15/25. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 7/11/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/8/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/8/25. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 9/4/25 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 04/24 11:03 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S15 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/24/25.4/24/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
18 18 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/18 4:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT filed by CAPTECH VENTURES, INC.. (SMITH, RENEE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 3:29 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S15 MOTION TO COMPEL NOT LATER THAN FRIDAY, 4/18/25 AT 5:00 PM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/16/25. 4/16/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/16 3:26 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CAPTECH CONSULTING IS AN IMPROPERLY NAMED DEFENDANT AND SPECIFICALLY, THAT CAPTECH CONSULTING IS NOT A LEGAL ENTITY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 4/16/25. 4/16/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Compel Wed 04/16 2:39 PM
MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT filed by TRACEY PAVLICIN.Certificate of Service.(SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Tue 04/15 1:49 PM
Letter dated April 15, 2025 by TRACEY PAVLICIN. (SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 03/07 12:55 PM
STIPULATION STIPULATION TO REMOVE DEFENDANT CAPTECH CONSULTING AND AMEND PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by TRACEY PAVLICIN. (SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
misc Remark Wed 02/05 8:26 AM
Mailed doc. 11 to Unrep. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 02/04 9:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Re: A Rule 16 Conference was held on 2/4/25. (fdc)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/04 9:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/5/25 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9614) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 5/30/25. DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 6/20/25. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/18/25. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/13/25. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/11/25. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 7/11/25. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/7/25 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/4/25. 2/4/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED. UNREP NOT MAILED. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 misc Report Of Wed 01/29 2:43 PM
Report Of Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by TRACEY PAVLICIN. (SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/17 4:22 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR TUESDAY, 2/4/25 AT 8:30 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 9400) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/17/24. 12/17/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M Silvanio on behalf of CAPTECH VENTURES, INC. with Certificate of Service(Silvanio, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/16 4:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CAPTECH VENTURES, INC..(SMITH, RENEE)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 12/16 4:04 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Markel Corporation with Certificate of Service by CAPTECH VENTURES, INC..(SMITH, RENEE)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RENEE N. SMITH on behalf of CAPTECH VENTURES, INC. with Certificate of Service(SMITH, RENEE)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/21 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACEY PAVLICIN. CAPTECH VENTURES, INC. waiver sent on 10/17/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/21 2:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRACEY PAVLICIN. CAPTECH CONSULTING waiver sent on 10/17/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to CAPTECH CONSULTING, CAPTECH VENTURES, INC.. Forwarded To: Lane Schiff on 10/10/24 (fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 10/09 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against CAPTECH CONSULTING, CAPTECH VENTURES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17801996.), filed by TRACEY PAVLICIN.(SCHIFF, LANE)
Related: [-]