Lawrence Weinstein v. Mortgage Contracting Services LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-02521 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 06, 2015 7:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Mortgage Contracting Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Mortgage Contracting Services, LLC
PECKAR & ABRAMSON, PC 1875 Century Park East Suite 550
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Weinstein
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
95 | 95
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 10/24 4:08 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys' fees $1,000,000.00; Class Counsel costs $20,175.40; $15,000.00 to Plaintiff Weinstein; ORDERS the payment of $18,750.00 to the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency; ORDERS the payment of $108,484.00 to the claims administrator; and DISMISSES the Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. Related to: Minutes of In Chambers Order94 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb) |
|
94 | 94
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 10/24 11:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 85 / and GRANTING Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement 88 . The Court: 1. GRANTS final approval of the Settlement Agreement; 2. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys fees in the amount of $1,000,000.00 3. AWARDS Class Counsel costs in the amount of $20,175.40 4. AWARDS $15,000 to Plaintiff Weinstein 5. ORDERS the payment of $18,750 to the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency; 6. ORDERS the payment of $108,484 to the claims administrator; and 7. DISMISSES the Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS such judgment be entered. (twdb) |