Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-cv-01211
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Credence Resource Management, LLC
Represented By
Whitney L. White
Sessions Israel & Shartle LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Perroux
Represented By
Tod Allen Lewis
Tod Lewis Law, PLLC
contact info
James M. Smith
Doherty Smith, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
Source Receivables Management, LLC
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.
Terminated: 01/06/2025


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/06 11:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/04 4:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Credence Resource Management, LLC.(White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Case No Longer Stayed Thu 03/06 11:57 AM
Case No Longer Stayed. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/05 3:54 PM
In light of the parties' notice of settlement, (Dkt. 24), IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file dismissal papers or a joint motion to extend the stay on or before March 20, 2025. Entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Wed 02/05 4:21 PM
Case Stayed until 3/20/2025. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/04 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Credence Resource Management, LLC by Brittany Perroux (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
23 23 notice Notice Tue 01/07 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Vacation by Credence Resource Management, LLC (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Parties Mon 01/06 3:33 PM
ORDER; IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. as a party in this case. Credence Resource Management, LLC remains in this case as a defendant. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Stayed Mon 01/06 3:37 PM
Case No Longer Stayed. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 01/03 10:08 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Credence Resource Management, LLC.(White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreed Scheduling Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/23 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brittany Perroux (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Parties Mon 12/09 4:40 PM
ORDER; IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC and Source Receivables Management, LLC as parties in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/09 12:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Credence Resource Management, LLC.(White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/06 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brittany Perroux (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/04 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brittany Perroux (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/06 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Brittany Perroux (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/06 10:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer complaint by Sequium by Brittany Perroux.(Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extension of Time to Answer
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/06 2:54 PM
Text Order GRANTING11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 9, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/06 3:00 PM
Text Order GRANTING13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 6, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/06 3:11 PM
Text Order GRANTING14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 9, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/06 3:19 PM
In light of the parties' notice of settlement, Dkt. 15, IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED as to Defendant Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. file dismissal papers or a joint motion to extend the stay on or before December 23, 2024. Entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 11/07 8:09 AM
Reset Deadline: Credence Resource Management, LLC answer due by 12/9/2024. (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 11/07 8:11 AM
Reset Deadlines: Source Receivables Management, LLC answer due by 12/6/2024. (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 11/07 8:13 AM
Reset Deadlines: Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC answer due by 12/9/2024. (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 11/07 8:15 AM
Case Stayed as to to Defendant Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. until 12/23/2024. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/05 6:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Source Receivables by Brittany Perroux.(Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extension of Time to Answer
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 11/05 1:39 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC. (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/05 1:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Credence Resource Management, LLC.(White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/05 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Whitney L. White on behalf of Credence Resource Management, LLC. Attorney Whitney L. White added to party Credence Resource Management, LLC(pty:dft) (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/21 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Perroux. Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC served on 10/17/2024, answer due 11/7/2024. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/21 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Perroux. Credence Resource Management, LLC served on 10/17/2024, answer due 11/7/2024. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/21 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Perroux. Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/21 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany Perroux. Source Receivables Management, LLC served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 10/11 4:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC. (cnr)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 10/11 2:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brittany Perroux. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Credence Resource Management, LLC, Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC, Source Receivables Management, LLC, Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/09 5:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brittany Perroux. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/09 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19328111), filed by Brittany Perroux.(Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/10 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 10/10 9:57 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Thu 10/10 9:57 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brittany Perroux. (kp)
Related: [-]