Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Rolando Olvera
Case #: 1:24-cv-00148
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Space Exploration Technologies Corporation
Represented By
David George Oliveira
Roerig, Oliveira & Fisher, LLP
contact info
David Lee Feinberg
Venable LLP
contact info
Tyler Guy Welti
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Save RGV
Represented By
Marisa Perales
Perales Allmon Ice PC
contact info
Lauren Claire Ice
Perales, Allmon & Ice, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/09/2024 6:40 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT against Space Exploration Technologies Corporation (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32314376) filed by Save RGV. (Ice, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - First Notice Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Second Notice Letter