New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-07129
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
ATTYX New York LLC
Defendant
Enterbank USA
Defendant
SUNCo Capital, LLC
Represented By
David A. Loglisci
Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana LLP
contact info
Defendant
Solar Mosiac, LLC
Represented By
Robert Guite
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Sophia Louise Cahill
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Defendant
ATTYX LLC
150 Eileen Way Suite #5
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
David A. Loglisci
Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana LLP
contact info
Defendant
ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar
150 Eileen Way Suite #5
Syosset, NY 11791
Represented By
David A. Loglisci
Forchelli Curto Deegan Schwartz Mineo & Terrana LLP
contact info
Defendant
Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA
15 West South Temple Suite 600
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Leah Nicole Jacob
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Webbank
215 South Street Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Robert Guite
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Lauture
188-17 119th Road
Queens, NY 11412
Represented By
Rruhija Matai-Sanchez
Jasa Legal Services For Elder Justice
contact info
Leslie Salzman
Cardozo Bet Tzedek Legal Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheila Simmons
14504 Lakewood Ave.
Queens, NY 11435
Represented By
Rruhija Matai-Sanchez
Jasa Legal Services For Elder Justice
contact info
Leslie Salzman
Cardozo Bet Tzedek Legal Services
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER that Mosaic and WebBank's 21 motion to compel arbitration is denied without prejudice to renew in light of the record and evidence developed during discovery. The parties will engage in discovery and proceed to a bench trial on the same schedule as set forth for the SUNco defendants in Judge Ross' 27 Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/5/2025 ) (RG)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
39 39 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 5:47 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-19023599 by Solar Mosiac, LLC. (Petersen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, April 24, 2025
38 38 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/24 3:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ATTYX LLC, ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar, SUNCo Capital, LLC. (Loglisci, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/24 3:48 PM
ORDER granting38 . Depositions to be completed by 5/30/2025; premotion conference letters to be filed by 6/18/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/24/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
37 37 misc Letter Fri 04/04 11:34 AM
Letter Re: Joining Motion to Compel Arbitration by Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/04 2:42 PM
ORDER. The Court having been advised by defendant Regions that it intends to join SUNCo's motion to compel arbitration, the Initial Status Conference set for 4/7/2025 is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order Mon 03/31 11:55 AM
ORDER granting36 . Defendant Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA's time to answer is extended to 4/28/2025. However, by 4/4/2025, defendant shall file a letter with the Court indicating whether it will join the other defendants' motions to compel arbitration. If defendant does not intend to move to compel arbitration, this Court will hold a telephonic Initial Status Conference on 4/7/2025 at 10:00 am, at which the Court will set a schedule for discovery on the merits. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 949146687#. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/31/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/27 4:05 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint,, by Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA. (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/24 11:15 AM
ORDER granting35 . Defendant Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA's time to answer is extended to 3/28/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/24/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/21 3:49 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint,, from 3/21/2025 to 3/28/2025 by Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA. (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
34 34 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay Wed 03/05 3:29 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER that Mosaic and WebBank's21 motion to compel arbitration is denied without prejudice to renew in light of the record and evidence developed during discovery. The parties will engage in discovery and proceed to a bench trial on the same schedule as set forth for the SUNco defendants in Judge Ross'27 Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/5/2025 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
33 33 respoth Reply in Support Mon 03/03 5:09 PM
REPLY in Support re21 Notice of MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Solar Mosiac, LLC, Webbank. (Guite, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Devon Treece in Support of Defendants Solar Mosaic LLC's and Webbank's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - DocuSign Certificate of Completion,
Att: 3 Exhibit D - Mosaic Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit E - Loan Closing Certificate
Friday, February 28, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/28 2:05 PM
ORDER granting31 . Defendant Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA's time to answer is extended to 3/21/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/28/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Memorandum in Opposition Fri 02/21 5:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 Notice of MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings In Opposition , AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re21 Notice of MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings In Opposition filed by Sheila Simmons. (Matai-Sanchez, Rruhija)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sheila Simmons in Opposition to Mosaic's Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A: SUNco Contract
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/21 12:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint,, from 2/21/25 to 3/21/25 by Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA. (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Nicole Jacob on behalf of Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA (aty to be noticed) (Jacob, Leah)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Fri 02/21 11:28 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/21/2025. (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Fri 02/21 11:28 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (CV)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Joinder Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 12:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: All deadlines set by Judge Ross remain the same. It is further ORDERED that defendant WebBank's29 motion to join defendant Solar Mosaic LLC's motion to compel arbitration is granted. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/21/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 motion Joinder Wed 02/19 12:46 PM
MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Solar Mosaic LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Webbank. (Guite, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
28 28 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Tue 02/18 12:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re27 Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Service of Order on Defendants EnerBank and WebBank by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 02/10 4:03 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The parties are directed to proceed in accordance with the attached order. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 2/10/2025. (HTK)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Mon 02/10 12:34 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Limited Admission; granting25 Motion for Limited Admission. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 2/10/2025. (HTK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 motion Limited Admission Fri 02/07 12:00 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Student Appearance by Dina Doctoroff on behalf of Plaintiffs Simmons and Lauture by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Doctoroff Request for Student Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Lauture
25 25 motion Limited Admission Fri 02/07 11:57 AM
MOTION for Limited Admission Student Appearance by Jacqueline Karp for Plaintiffs Lauture and Simmons by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Karp request for student appearance by Pleaintiff Lauture
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 02/06 7:30 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order for Discovery Prior to Limited Bench Trial by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/05 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Louise Cahill on behalf of Solar Mosiac, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Cahill, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/31 2:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solar Mosiac, LLC (Guite, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Compel Stay Fri 01/31 2:12 PM
Notice of MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Solar Mosiac, LLC. (Guite, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Devon Treece in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A- Loan Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-Sheila Summons-Welcome Call Transcript.,
Att: 5 Proposed Order re: Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings.
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Tue 01/28 2:17 PM
Letter in Opposition to Pre-Motion Letter Compel Arbitration by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/23 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rruhija Matai-Sanchez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Matai-Sanchez, Rruhija)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
notice Notice(Other) Tue 01/21 3:26 PM
NOTICE. Defendant has submitted a letter requesting a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to compel arbitration. Plaintiffs' counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Motion Practices, plaintiffs are required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven business days from service of defendant's letter. (HTK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
18 18 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 01/16 12:45 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re8 Amended Complaint,, by SUNCo Capital, LLC, ATTYX LLC, ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar. (Loglisci, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Lauture Contract,
Att: 3 Simmons Contract
Thursday, January 02, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 1:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons. ATTYX LLC served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024; ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar served on 12/5/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/02 1:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons. SUNCo Capital, LLC served on 12/6/2024, answer due 12/27/2024. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service by Mail
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/31 5:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons. Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA served on 12/6/2024, answer due 12/27/2024. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/31 5:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons. Webbank served on 12/6/2024, answer due 12/27/2024. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service by Mail on WebBank
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/18 6:50 PM
ORDER: Defendants SUNCo Capital, LLC and ATTYX, LLC request, with plaintiff's consent, an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. ECF No.13 . The request is granted. SUNCo Capital, LLC and ATTYX, LLC shall respond to the amended complaint by January 27, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/18/2024. (JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/17 9:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Amended Complaint,, by SUNCo Capital, LLC, ATTYX LLC, ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar. (Loglisci, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/05 5:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons. Solar Mosiac, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2024, answer due 2/3/2025. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/04 1:53 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 9:34 AM
Summons Issued as to ATTYX LLC, ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar, Enterbank USA, Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA, SUNCo Capital, LLC, Solar Mosiac, LLC, Webbank. (RG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/26 11:24 AM
Proposed Summons. Re8 Amended Complaint,, by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 11/26 10:48 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 440 Rev 6/12, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION or AO 441 Rev 7/10, SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The CLERK OF COURT name needs to be updated. As of 2/1/2022, Brenna B. Mahoney is the Clerk of Court. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/25 6:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against SUNCo Capital, LLC, Solar Mosiac, LLC, ATTYX LLC, ATTYX, LLC d/b/a SUNco Capital and SUNco Solar, Webbank, Regions/Enerbank USA d/b/a EnerBank USA, filed by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A. 9/5/22 Lauture (EnerBank) Loan Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Simmons Home Photographs,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Simmons (Mosaic) 8/19/2024 Billing Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Simmons (WebBank) 10/10/2023 Loan Agreement,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Amended Summons
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wed 10/16 7:52 AM
APPROVAL re6 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Administration Manager on 10/16/2024. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 motion Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Tue 10/15 12:25 PM
MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Sheila Simmons. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 10/11 11:08 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 10/11 11:07 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/11 11:05 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/10 6:16 PM
Summons Issued as to ATTYX New York LLC, Enterbank USA, SUNCo Capital, LLC, Solar Mosiac, LLC. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/10 4:46 PM
by Marie Lauture, Sheila Simmons (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Thu 10/10 2:33 PM
NOTICE! Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a COMPLETED SECOND PAGE of the Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (KD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/09 10:54 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18372957 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sheila Simmons, Marie Lauture. (Salzman, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet