Alabama Middle District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00314
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 10, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eric M Counts
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Barry Dewayne Cooper (1)
Terminated: 10/08/2024
Represented By
Federal Defender
Federal Defenders
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/10/2024 3:20 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of Barry Dewayne Cooper (KR)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Barry Dewayne Cooper. (KR)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel: Appointed Federal Defender for Barry Dewayne Cooper (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/8/2024. (KR)
Related: [-]
1 1 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Barry Dewayne Cooper (KR)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 Hearing by Barry Dewayne Cooper (KR)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Barry Dewayne Cooper. Defendant committed to Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/8/2024. (KR)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Barry Dewayne Cooper held on 10/8/2024 (PDF available for court use only) Related [+] (KR) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/9/2024) (KR).
Related: [-] cording Time 4:02-4:10.