Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-04049
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 10, 2024 2:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Travis Vinton Goff (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jim Y. Lynn, Jr
United States Attorney'S Office-Jcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/10/2024 5:01 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Travis Vinton Goff (1) counts 1, 2, and 3. (Warren, Melissa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/8/2024 to reflect the correct indictment accepted by the Court. NEF regenerated.) (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. as to Travis Vinton Goff. Signed on 10/8/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough.(Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]