Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:24-cv-23912
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Terminated:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Represented By
Bryan F. DuBon
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby
contact info
Plaintiff
Arantza Castro
Represented By
Richard John Adams, Jr.
Adams & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Diego German Mendez
Mendez Law Offices, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 02/07 2:18 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) . All Pending Motions in this case are DENIED as MOOT and this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 02/03 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Arantza Castro (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 12/26 2:41 PM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT: The Clerk shall Administratively Close this case for statistical purposes only. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 12/20 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Arantza Castro (Adams, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/04 2:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 3, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/4/2024. (knu)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/04 1:48 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (DuBon, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 12/04 3:17 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: SLT Lending SPV, Inc. response/answer due 1/3/2025. Per DE 8 Order. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/04 4:31 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 4, 2024 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/4/2024. (knu)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 11/04 4:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Attorney Bryan F. DuBon added to party SLT Lending SPV, Inc.(pty:dft). (DuBon, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/05 2:37 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: SLT Lending SPV, Inc. response/answer due 12/4/2024. Per DE 6 Order. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 10/15 8:21 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Arantza Castro. SLT Lending SPV, Inc. served on 10/14/2024, response/answer due 11/4/2024. (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/10 9:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/10 8:41 AM
COMPLAINT against SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17898813, filed by Arantza Castro.(Adams, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)