Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Stephanie L Haines
Case #: 3:24-cv-00239
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Middle, 1:24-cv-01666
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Andres Alcala
Represented By
John F. Deasy
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Defendant
Trius Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
John F. Deasy
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Mediator
HARRY M. PARAS
Represented By
Harry M. Paras
Harry M. Paras, Esquire, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Johnson II
Represented By
Ashley Marie Henkle
Simon & Simon, P.C.
contact info
Kane Daly
Simon & Simon
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
29 29 adr Report of Mediation Fri 05/02 10:03 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 5/1/2025. Case has not been resolved. HARRY M. PARAS terminated. Attorney Harry M. Paras terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . (Paras, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
28 28 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 02/11 9:29 AM
Errata re26 Motion to Continue Mediation by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. Reason for Correction: Attaching proposed order. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 02/10 3:57 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Continue. The mediation that was to take place on February 28, 2025, will now take place on May 1, 2025, with Mediator Harry Paras. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time, and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before April 1, 2025. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 2/10/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cag)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Mon 02/10 4:00 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re26 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 motion Continue Fri 02/07 3:15 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Mediation and Extend Date for Mediation by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/30 3:07 PM
ORDER OF COURT granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kane Daly terminated from the above-captioned matter. Attorney Ashley Henkle will remain as counsel for Plaintiff, Andrew Johnson. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/30/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/30 11:17 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew Johnson II. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
misc QC - Wrong event selected Mon 01/13 11:35 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: IN THE FUTURE, please use correct event. Document attached is PROPOSED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER This message is for informational purposes only.- NO ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 01/06 2:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - Mediation. Harry Paras is appointed as mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded on or before February 28, 2025, unless extended by Order of the Court. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before January 28, 2025, and as more fully stated in said Order Referring Case to ADR. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/6/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Case Management Order Mon 01/06 1:06 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - It is ORDERED that compliance with the provisions of Local Rule 16.1 shall be completed as follows: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2025. The parties shall complete all fact discovery by 6/30/2025. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/31/2025. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 7/30/2025, at 10:30 AM before Judge Stephanie L. Haines, and as more fully stated in said Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/6/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 01/06 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephanie L. Haines: Court convened for initial case management conference by telephone. Counsel provided a summary of their positions on the case. As to settlement, Plaintiff's counsel indicates she will be providing a demand after further information is received and Defense is waiting for a video to verify the accident. The parties are scheduled to attend a mediation on February 28, 2025 with mediator Harry Paras. The Court provided the Parties with procedure for discovery disputes. The Court will enter the proposed initial scheduling order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter: Shirley Hall) (dlg)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/06 10:24 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 12/19 1:39 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by Andrew Johnson II. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 12/13 11:02 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 11/26 11:57 AM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 11/25 12:16 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 11/25 10:56 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held on January 6, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. In order to further public health and safety and minimize travel by participants in Court proceedings, the Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be conducted via TEAMS conference line. Counsel of record shall receive the dial-in number and access code by email, and as more fully stated in the Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 11/25/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process,
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Mon 11/25 3:53 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re16 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement due by 12/2/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
14 14 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Wed 11/20 4:18 PM
Errata re12 Answer to Complaint by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. Reason for Correction: Add attorney information. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Wed 11/20 4:15 PM
Errata re11 Notice of Appearance by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. Reason for Correction: Added attorney information. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/20 3:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/20 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Deasy on behalf of Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc.. (Deasy, John)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Wed 11/20 4:02 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re11 Notice of Appearance,12 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information, specifically the Bar ID number, the email address, phone number, and office address. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) and refile using the Errata event. (rjr)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 4:03 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re11 Notice of Appearance,12 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 11/27/2024. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 11/12 10:18 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by Andrew Johnson II. Trius Trucking, Inc. served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 10/23 1:54 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Andrew Johnson II as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by Andrew Johnson II. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 10/23 12:27 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re8 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/22 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Henkle on behalf of Andrew Johnson II. (Henkle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 11:15 AM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order) Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/16/2024. (dag)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 10/16 11:12 AM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (for Clerk of Court Personnel Only) Thu 10/10 10:32 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:24-cv-01666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Thu 10/10 9:12 AM
ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER the above-captioned matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk of Court shall thereafter CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/10/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/10 10:40 AM
Judge Stephanie L. Haines added. (bgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before Tuesday, October 8, 2024, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania pursuant to Section 1404(a). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/1/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 Summons Issued as to Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 COMPLAINT against Andres Alcala, Trius Trucking, Inc. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6771750), filed by Andrew Johnson II.(rw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet