Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:24-cv-05865
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 1:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Regina Rainbolt
Represented By
Naomi Ahsan
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Mark F. O'Donnell
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Paul A Brachvogel
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Skaar
5802 VICKERY AVE E
TACOMA, WA 98443
Defendant
Tacoma Public Schools
Represented By
Naomi Ahsan
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Mark F. O'Donnell
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Tiffany Haskins
Represented By
Valerie Rose
Walkup Melodia Kelly & Schoenberger
contact info
Evan Thomas Fuller
Connelly Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Jackson Robert Pahlke
Connelly Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Spencer J Pahlke
Walkup Melodia Kelly & Schoenberger
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Fri 01/24 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *EIGHT - TEN DAY* Jury Trial is set for 5/12/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/3/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/3/2025, Motions due by 12/15/2025, Discovery completed by 1/12/2026, Dispositive motions due by 2/11/2026, Motions in Limine due by 4/6/2026, Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/21/2026, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 4/21/2026, Deposition Designations due by 4/21/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2026 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
19 19 misc Joint Status Report Wed 01/22 5:04 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. Filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt, Plaintiff Tiffany Haskins.(Ahsan, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark F. O'Donnell on behalf of Defendants Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt. (O'Donnell, Mark)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Naomi Ahsan on behalf of Defendants Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt. (Ahsan, Naomi)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Fri 12/13 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Paul A Brachvogel for Defendants Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt. (Brachvogel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/06 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt.(Brachvogel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul A Brachvogel on behalf of Defendants Tacoma Public Schools, Regina Rainbolt. (Brachvogel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 11:27 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Kathleen Skaar.(MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
12 12 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Thu 10/24 1:37 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/8/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2025, Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Fri 10/18 8:53 AM
Attorney Evan Thomas Fuller added for Tiffany Haskins; per7 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:59 PM
ORDER re9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Valerie Rose for Plaintiff Tiffany Haskins, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 4:58 PM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Spencer J Pahlke for Plaintiff Tiffany Haskins, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 11:01 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Valerie N. Rose FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8676828 (Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/17 10:58 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Spencer J. Pahlke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8676817 (Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jackson Robert Pahlke on behalf of Plaintiff Tiffany Haskins. (Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
6 6 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 10/16 3:20 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s). See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc via ad hoc Attorney Fuller(CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/11 5:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 3:19 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Regina Rainbolt, Kathleen Skaar, Tacoma Public Schools. (MW)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 10/10 3:07 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Praecipe for a Summons Thu 10/10 10:21 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by All Plaintiffs(Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 10/10 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Jackson Robert Pahlke added to party O. W.(pty:pla) filed by O. W..(Pahlke, Jackson)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8667754
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/10 3:05 PM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MW)
Related: [-]