Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:24-cv-01360
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, 2422-CC10766
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 08, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant
All Persons Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, or Lien Interest in Property in Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title or Any Cloud on Plaintiff's Thereto and Does 1-100 In
Defendant
CMS Foreclosure Trustee Corp
Defendant
Rushmore and Mr. Cooper
Represented By
Caleb J. Halberg
Dykema Gossett - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
4425 Ponce de Leon, 5th Floor
Coral Gables, FL 33146
Represented By
Caleb J. Halberg
Dykema Gossett - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
PrimeLending
Represented By
Duane L. Coleman
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
House of Loudermilk Trust
3631 Hartford Street
St. Louis, MO 63116
Plaintiff
Derek Loudermilk
Trustee 3631 Hartford Street
St. Louis, MO 63116


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 05/08 10:59 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re25 Entry of Appearance Proof of Service on Plaintiffs by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Rushmore and Mr. Cooper. (Seitz, Theodore)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 05/08 10:36 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Theodore Seitz for Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Rushmore and Mr. Cooper. (Seitz, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
24 24 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 02/10 3:54 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by House of Loudermilk Trust. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
23 23 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Fri 01/31 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re22 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff House of Loudermilk Trust. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify all members of House of Loudermilk Trust in section 2 of the form, to include their name and state of citizenship. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed. (ANR)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 01/31 9:04 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 23. Fri Jan 31 09:04:22 CST 2025 (ANR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
22 22 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 01/31 8:59 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by House of Loudermilk Trust. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (ANR)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 01/30 3:16 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Derek Loudermilk. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
20 20 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Mon 11/25 8:26 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Derek Loudermilk, House of Loudermilk Trust - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] .(TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Additional Disclsoure Statement
misc Order Receipt Mon 11/25 8:26 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Mon Nov 25 08:26:39 CST 2024 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
19 19 respm Surresponse to Motion (Need Leave of Court) Mon 11/18 9:14 AM
SURRESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Derek Loudermilk. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/05 3:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Rushmore and Mr. Cooper, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/29 11:26 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs House of Loudermilk Trust, Derek Loudermilk. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
16 16 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Thu 10/24 11:47 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs House of Loudermilk Trust, Derek Loudermilk. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] .(TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Additional Disclsoure Statement
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 10/24 11:29 AM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PrimeLending, PlainsCapital Bank, Plains Capital Corporation, Hilltop Holdings, Inc... (Coleman, Duane)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 10/24 11:48 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16. Thu Oct 24 11:48:20 CDT 2024 (Tillman, Tiffani)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 10/23 3:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PrimeLending, PlainsCapital Bank, Plains Capital Corporation, Hilltop Holdings, Inc... (Coleman, Duane)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Case Wed 10/23 3:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant PrimeLending. (Coleman, Duane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 10/16 12:42 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rushmore and Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., BlackRock Inc., The Vanguard Group, Inc., Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc... (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 10/16 12:20 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp... (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Wed 10/16 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re8 Disclosure Statement,9 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Rushmore and Mr. Cooper. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Please fill out and file the Court-provided Disclosure Statement (MOED-0001) which can be found on the Court's website under Forms section. Sections 1 and 2 of the Statement must be filled out completely - section 2 to include the state of incorporation/formation AND the primary state of business for each defendant (and it's member(s) if the defendant is an LLC). An Amended Disclosure Statement must be filed for each defendant. (ANR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 10/15 4:31 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp... (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 10/15 4:27 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rushmore and Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Rushmore Servicing, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., BlackRock Inc., The Vanguard Group, Inc... (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order CJRA Order Tue 10/15 10:27 AM
CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
6 6 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 10/14 3:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Rushmore and Mr. Cooper. (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Case Mon 10/14 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Rushmore and Mr. Cooper. (Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
4 4 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Thu 10/10 6:27 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Thu 10/10 2:26 PM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Derek Loudermilk, House of Loudermilk Trust.(JWD)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Thu 10/10 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Rushmore and Mr. Cooper Sent To: Plaintiff and State Court - Unexecuted (JWD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Thu 10/10 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit St. Louis City, Missouri, case number 2422-CC10766, with receipt number AMOEDC-10875899, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Rushmore and Mr. Cooper.(Halberg, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Attachment State Case Docket,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 10/10 2:30 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]