Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:24-bk-30554
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2024
Dismissed:May 09, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
White Violet Property, LLC, Debtor
358 Sewall St
Ludlow, MA 01056-2711
Represented By
William J Amann
Amann Burnett, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of the U. S. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Sunday, May 11, 2025
51 51 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 05/12 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 50 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Friday, May 09, 2025
50 50 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/09 10:27 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 5/9/2025 Re:40 Motion filed by William J Amann to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor White Violet Property, LLC. GRANTED. (ag)
Related: [-]
49 49 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral Fri 05/09 10:25 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 5/9/2025 Re:16 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor White Violet Property, LLC for Use of Cash Collateral. MOOT; SEE DISMISSAL ORDER OF EVEN DATE. (ag)
Related: [-]
48 48 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 05/09 10:22 AM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 5/9/25 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor White Violet Property, LLC. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED. (ag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court Hearing Held Fri 05/09 10:20 AM
Hearing Held Related [+]. (ag)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor White Violet Property, LLC
court Hearing Held Fri 05/09 10:23 AM
Hearing Held Related [+]. (ag)
Related: [-] 16 Expedited Motion filed by Debtor White Violet Property, LLC for Use of Cash Collateral
court Hearing Held Fri 05/09 10:26 AM
Hearing Held Related [+]. (ag)
Related: [-] 40 Motion filed by William J Amann to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor White Violet Property, LLC
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
47 47 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference Tue 05/06 10:35 AM
Endorsed Order dated 5/6/2025 Re:46 Motion filed by Creditor Raymond C. Green Funding, LLC to Appear Telephonically at Hearing Scheduled for May 8, 2025 [Re:16 Motion for Cash Collateral,40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]. GRANTED; ATTORNEY RUTTENBERG MAY PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY BY DIALING 646-828-7666, AND ENTERING MEETING ID 160 580 6834, AND USING PASSCODE 767 325 WHEN PROMPTED. (ag)
Related: [-]