Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Gershwin A Drain
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12664
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Attorney General
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff
Alexey Bittir
5920 Sheridan St.
Detroit, MI 48213
Plaintiff
Marina Panicheva
5920 Sheridan St.
Detroit, MI 48213


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case* Tue 11/26 2:48 PM
Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *11/26/2024*. Designated lead case number is 24-11437 . (SSch)
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs order Order Tue 11/26 2:47 PM
ORDER Consolidating and Merging Cases. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 order Reassignment/Disqualification Fri 11/01 12:55 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Fri 10/11 1:42 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 notice Filing Fee Not Paid* Thu 10/10 2:22 PM
Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 10/24/2024 (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 10/10 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Marina Panicheva, Alexey Bittir against Attorney General, Department of Homeland Security (SSch)
Related: [-]