Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-05578
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Case in other court:Missouri Western, 6:24-cv-03164
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
City Utilities of Springfield, MO
Represented By
Nicolle B Brito
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Frank Paul Calamita, III
Aqualaw
contact info
Dorothy Antullis
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Mark J Dearman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 10/10 11:48 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Western, 6:24-cv-03164, City Utilities of Springfield, MO v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:24-cv-05578-RMG (jbin)
Related: [-]
15 15 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 10/10 11:31 AM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 6:24-cv-03164. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
14 14 On July 24, 2024, the Court ordered that the parties file a joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal by October 7, 2024. A Joint Status Report has been filed. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a status report or a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 10/4/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sandusky, Karri) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
13 13 MDL TRANSFER ORDER, from Nathaniel M. Gorton, Acting Chair, transferring case to District of South Carolina to be included in MDL No. 2873. Signed on 10/4/24. Case electronically transferred. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
12 12 STATUS REPORT by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
10 10 On July 24, 2024, the parties filed a joint status report. (Doc. #9 .) On June 27, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status report within 30 days, given the extension of time for Defendant 3M Company to file its responsive pleading 28 days after the JPML issues a final order regarding consolidating this case into an MDL. As the parties have informed the Court that it expects a ruling from the JPML around October 7, 2024, the parties are ORDERED to submit a status report on or before October 7, 2024. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 STATUS REPORT by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 Before the Court is a Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (Doc. #7 .) For good cause show, the motion is GRANTED. Defendant 3M Company may file its responsive pleading 28 days after the JPML has issued a final order determining whether to transfer this action to the AFFF Products Liability Litigation MDL. It is also hereby ORDERED that the parties file a status report within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed on 6/27/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 STIPULATION for extension of time to file responsive pleading by City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 ORDER granting3 ,4 , &5 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Nicolle B. Brito, Dorothy P. Antullis and Mark J. Dearman for City Utilities of Springfield, MO allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 Motion to allow Nicolle B. Brito to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046452) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Motion to allow Dorothy P. Antullis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046443) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to allow Mark J. Dearman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9046405) filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. (Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company filed by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City Utilities of Springfield, MO. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9038854. Service due by 9/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Calamita, Frank) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Proposed Summons
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/3/2024 as Document No. 1-5, Summons. The Summons attached to the motion has been deleted. Any Summons should include the case number and sent to the Clerk's Office through CM/ECF Civil Events > E-Mail the Court > E-Mail Proposed Summons to be Issued. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M Company. (Siegert, Karen) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 10/10/2024.]
Related: [-]