South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 9:24-cv-05714
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:3131 Miller Act
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Calvin Whitfield
102 Graduate Lane
Ladson, SC 29456
Plaintiff
Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gray Insurance Company, The
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Claimant
Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Gray Insurance Company, The
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
Defendant
CCCS International LLC
Terminated: 02/05/2025
Defendant
Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The
Terminated: 02/05/2025
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gray Insurance Company, The
Terminated: 02/05/2025
Represented By
David A Harris
Bovis Kyle Burch And Medlin LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc
Terminated: 03/17/2025
Represented By
Matthew Lynn Tomsic
Rayburn Cooper And Durham
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 misc Case Reassigned CV Tue 04/29 11:41 AM
Case Reassigned to Honorable David C Norton. Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/17 1:31 PM
ORDER ON THE JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. Details set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/17/2025.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 motion Dismiss Tue 03/04 12:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice claims against Defendants The Gray Insurance Company and The Gray Casualty & Surety Company by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tomsic, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/04 10:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. (Tomsic, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
19 19 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/09 9:16 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Calvin Whitfield, CCCS International LLC per17 ,18 (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 01/08 4:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CCCS International, LLC byGray Insurance Company, The, Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The. (Harris, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Request for Entry of Default Wed 01/08 4:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Calvin Whitfield byGray Insurance Company, The, Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The. (Harris, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/05 2:18 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/27/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/10/2025, Rule 26 Report due by 1/10/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/5/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/4/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/5/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/12/2025, Discovery due by 6/3/2025, Motion in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Motions due by 6/17/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 9/2/2025 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/5/2024. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 12/04 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The, Gray Insurance Company, The. Calvin Whitfield served on 11/30/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Harris, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 12/02 2:51 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CCCS International LLC per13 (Motion for further relief at "B." remains pending) (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 motion Entry of Default Mon 11/25 1:50 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tomsic, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Calvin Whitfield. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Crossclaim Fri 11/22 2:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Calvin Whitfield, CROSSCLAIM against CCCS International LLC by Gray Insurance Company, The, Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The.(Harris, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Indemnity Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint,
Att: 3 Summons for Third-Party Defendant
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 11/22 2:53 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The, Gray Insurance Company, The.(Harris, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A Harris on behalf of Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The, Gray Insurance Company, The (Harris, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/05 4:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Notice of Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/19/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Tomsic, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 10/29 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. All Defendants.(Tomsic, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Return Receipts
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 12:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Gray Insurance Company, The. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 12:48 PM
Summons Issued as to CCCS International LLC. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 10/10 12:42 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/10 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against CCCS International LLC, Gray Casualty & Surety Company, The, Gray Insurance Company, The ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12037895.), filed by Alternative Roofing Solutions Inc. Service due by 1/7/2025(sshe, ) Modified docket text for typo on 10/10/2024 (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Performance and Payment Bond