Barras v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy D Degiusti |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-02435 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Barras
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting18 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. SCHEDULING ORDER: Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 9/1/2025; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 9/15/2025; Pla witness list due 9/15/2025; Dft witness list due 9/29/2025; Pla exhibit list due 9/15/2025; Dft exhibit list due 9/29/2025; Motions in limine due 1/16/2026; Jury instructions due 1/16/2026; Voir dire requests due 1/16/2026; ( Discovery due by 12/27/2025., Motions due by 11/27/2025., Pretrial Report due by 1/16/2026.), Motions terminated:18 JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings re Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/28/2025. (jee) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings re Scheduling Order Deadlines by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Clack, Lance) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days of this order; Motions to amend due within 14 days of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/3/2025; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/14/2025; Pla witness list due 6/17/2025; Pla exhibit list due 6/17/2025; Motions in limine due 9/3/2025; Jury instructions due 9/3/2025; Voir dire requests due 9/3/2025; Trial briefs due 9/3/2025; Discovery due by 8/1/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 7/2/2025. Pretrial Report due by 9/3/2025.THE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/17/2025 IS STRICKEN.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/12/2024. (jee) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Jonathan Barras, Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Davidoff, Bill) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Reagan Toledano on behalf of Jonathan Barras (Toledano, Reagan) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/19/24. (rp) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 301 before Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. Parties are to confer and by joint participation prepare and electronically file the Joint Status Report with combined Discovery Plan with the Clerk of the Court NOT LATER THAN DECEMBER 5, 2024, pursuant to LCvR16.1(a)(1) and LCvR26.1 (jee) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Receipt for Money Received from Jonathan Barras in the amount of $100, receipt number 500009451 regarding11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ekw) |
|
11 | 11
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Barras.(Aizenman, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Bill E. Davidoff on behalf of Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Davidoff, Bill) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bill E. Davidoff, providedcounsel files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4.1. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/30/2024. (jee) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Lance V Clack on behalf of Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Clack, Lance) |
|
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Bill E. Davidoff Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4555249 by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Barrow, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Lance V. Clack,provided counsel files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/25/2024. (jee) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Lance Clack Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4552794 by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Barrow, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company . (Barrow, Christopher) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Barrow, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Barrow, Christopher) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Fri 10/11 9:34 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4542692. (Barrow, Christopher) |
||
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-2435 filed by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |