California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02066
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 12:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (1)
Represented By
Tommy Hai Vu
Stitt Vu Trial Lawyers
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amy L. Brammell
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO May 09 2025
JUDGMENT as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Custody of the BOP for 24 months as to count 1 and 2 to run concurrent to one another for a total of 24 months, 3 years supervised release as to count 1 and 2 to run concurrent to one another for a total of 3 years, $100.00 assessment as to count 1 and 2 for a total of $200.00 imposed and no fine. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino (aas)

Docket last updated: 10/11/2024 2:30 AM PDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva.(fjp) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva: Initial Appearance set for 9/13/2024 before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. (no document attached) (gac) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva held on 9/13/2024. Appointed Attorney Tommy Hai Vu(n/a) for Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 9/26/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. Arraignment set for 10/10/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. )Government oral motion to detain(Flight).( Detention Hearing - RF set for 9/17/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks.) (Interpreter Indra Zuno-Pantoja, Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 9/13/2024 BJC 24-1:2:08-2:53). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin, Marissa Martinez FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (cxl) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs ORDER as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 9/13/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. Report prepared by: M. Decker. (Document applicable to USA, Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amy L. Brammell appearing for USA. (Brammell, Amy)Attorney Amy L. Brammell added to party USA(pty:pla) (mef). [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Detention Hearing as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva held on 9/17/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Preliminary Hearing not held as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/10/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. (Interpreter Paula Navarro). (CD# 9/17/2024 BJC 227-234). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Tommy Vu, CJA). (Mackenzie Decker and Esther Sanchez, PTSO).(no document attached) (tlw) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 09/17/2024. (mef) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva. On the Court's own motion, the Arraignment and Preliminary Hearing set for 10/10/2024 is vacated and reset for 10/8/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. (no document attached) (tlw) [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 2 pgs NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Brammell, Amy) (axi). [3:24-mj-03483-BJC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (1) count(s) 1, 2. (tlw)
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Arraignment on Information as to Jesus Alfonso Acosta Leyva (1) Count 1,2 held on 10/8/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/8/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. (Interpreter Daniel Novoa). (CD# 10/8/2024 BJC 111-126). (Plaintiff Attorney Henry F.B. Beshar, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Tommy Vu, CJA). (tlw)
Related: [-]