Idaho District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00229
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 1:27 AM MDT
Defendant
Tyson James Jardine (1)
Represented By
John Cacheris
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Idaho Federal Defender
Federal Defender Services Of Idaho Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David Gregory Robins
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2024 2:55 AM MDT
Thursday, September 26, 2024
2 2 COMPLAINT (Notice sent to USP & USM) as to Tyson James Jardine (1). (hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Service Information Sheet
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Tyson James Jardine (Notice sent to USP & USM) Initial Appearance set for 9/30/2024 12:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (at)
Related: [-]
15 15 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed. Warrant Returned was filed with the Clerks Office on 10/04/2024 in case as to Tyson James Jardine. (hs) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 MOTION for Detention (Notice sent to USP) by USA as to Tyson James Jardine. (Robins, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham: Appearance by David Robins for the Government; Federal Defender John Cacheris appointed for the Defendant. Probation Officer Jessica Kinsel present. Initial Appearance as to Tyson James Jardine held on 9/30/2024. Court reviewed CJA23 Financial Affidavit. Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights executed. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing requested. (Notice sent to USP & USM) (Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 10/4/2024 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham.) Order of Temporary Detention entered. Time in Court 12:34-12:42 PM. (ESR A. Tate.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 6. (at) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
7 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER: as to Tyson James Jardine. On the basis of the sworn financial affidavit, the Court finds Defendant is financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Defender Services of Idaho is hereby appointed to represent Defendant in these proceedings pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Defender shall immediately notify the Clerk's Office of any conflict of interest or inability to continue this appointment. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (at) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
8 8 DOCKET TEXT DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Tyson James Jardine: The Government shall adhere to all provisions of General Order #392. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (at) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Tyson James Jardine (Notice sent to USP & USM). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG] (Entered: 10/01/2024)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Tyson James Jardine (hs) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Tyson James Jardine (hs) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Cacheris appearing for Tyson James Jardine (Notice sent to USM) (Cacheris, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
13 13 21 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to Tyson James Jardine re5 MOTION for Detention (Notice sent to USP) (Robins, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham: Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Tyson James Jardine held on 10/4/2024. Following oral argument by both parties, the Court ordered the Defendant detained, as stated on the record. Government's Motion for Detention, Dkt. 5, is hereby GRANTED. Order of Detention entered. (Notice sent to USP & USM) (ESR A. Tate.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 6. (at) (at)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 1,
Att: 2 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 2,
Att: 3 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 3,
Att: 4 (10/4/2024) Exhibit DftEx4,
Att: 5 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 5,
Att: 6 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 7,
Att: 7 (10/4/2024) Exhibit Dft Ex 8
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Tyson James Jardine (Notice sent to USP & USM). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (at) [1:24-mj-00238-DKG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
16 16 TIME CONSTRAINTS MEMO (SEALED) as to Tyson James Jardine. (available to USA, Tyson James Jardine) RESTRICTED TO COUNSEL AND COURT (sw)
Related: [-]
17 17 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT (SEALED) as to Tyson James Jardine. (available to USA, Tyson James Jardine) RESTRICTED TO COUNSEL AND COURT (sw)
Related: [-]
19 19 INDICTMENT (Notice sent to USM) as to Tyson James Jardine (1) count(s) 1. (hs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Service Information Sheet,
Att: 3 Sealed Foreperson Signature