Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00192
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (1)
Represented By
Dennise Moreno
Federal Defender Services Of Wisconsin Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Karine Moreno-Taxman
United States Department Of Justice (ed-Wi)
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2024 3:53 AM CDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (1). (rcm) [2:24-mj-00896-NJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
Arrest of Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (edr)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (edr)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint set for 9/11/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(edr)
Related: [-]
2 2 Warrant Returned Executed on 9/11/2024 as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson. (edr)
Related: [-]
3 3 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT - BOND STUDY ( Restricted ) filed by US Pretrial Office as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (jb)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for Initial Appearance as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson held on 9/11/2024. before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Defendant advised of charges, penalties, fines. Government argued for detention. Defense proffered release. Court ordered Defendant detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment & Plea set for 9/19/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Court Reporter Liberty) (edr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/11/2024. (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
6 6 UPDATE FOR 9/19/24 PRELIMINARY HEARING (No action required - Restricted ) filed by US Probation Office as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson ( NOTICE: Counsel for the defendant is required to provide a copy of this document to the defendant. Parties allowed to view this document may do so by logging in. ) (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/18/2024 granting8 Motion to Adjourn as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (1). The Clerk of Court's Office to reschedule the hearing. (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennise Moreno appearing for Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson as Federal Public Defender (Moreno, Dennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 Unopposed MOTION to Adjourn Preliminary Hearing by Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson.(Moreno, Dennise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson. Preliminary Hearing RESCHEDULED TO 9/24/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(edr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for Preliminary Hearing as to Kirk RC Mickelson held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/24/2024: Testimony taken and exhibit received. Court makes finding of probable cause. (Court Reporter Liberty 10:36-12:07) (rcm) (rcm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/25/2024) Exhibit 1
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 10/8/2024 for Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson: The court is satisfied that the defendant is financially unable to obtain counsel and the appointment of counsel is in the interest of justice; Dennise Moreno appointed effective 9/18/2024. (cc: all counsel) (edr)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMENT as to Kirk Robert Christ Mickelson (1) counts 1-2. (mlm) (mlm).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/9/2024) Information Sheet,
Att: 2 (10/9/2024) Unredacted Indictment