Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00492
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros (1)
Represented By
Kristen D. Langford-Harris
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Joseph Farrelly Griffith
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/11/2024 3:39 AM CDT
Saturday, September 21, 2024
Arrest of Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros. (as2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 22, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 9/23/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mwh2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kristen D. Langford-Harris, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros, filed. (Langford-Harris, Kristen) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Interpreter needed as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros added. (as2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros (Defendant informed of rights) held on 9/23/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. Court grants continuance of the detention hearing. Rights to consular notification given. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Zachary Bird, AUSA; Christopher Jenkins for Defendant; USPO: Rebecca Cavazos; USM: Deputy Holloway. (Digital # 9:55-10:03) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used) Deft remanded to custody. (as2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (as2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Resetting as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros. Parties notified. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing reset for 9/25/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros held on 9/25/2024 Defendant waives both hearings in open court. Appearances: Patricia Booth, AUSA; Kristen Langford-Harris f/Defendant; USPO: Elizabeth Donez-Delgado; USM: G. Gonzalez. (Digital # 10:21-10:23) (ERO: Terry Lozano) (Interpreter: M. Macossay/used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros, filed. (jc2) [2:24-mj-00442]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros (1) count(s) 1, filed. (fmc2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
8 8 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros, filed. (fmc2)
Related: [-]
9 9 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jose Alfredo Ontiveros-Ontiveros. Arraignment set for 10/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton) Parties notified. (fmc2)
Related: [-]