Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Elaine E Bucklo
Case #: 1:24-cv-09920
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Defendant
3dpremiumproducts
Defendant
Anime Life Toy Store
Defendant
BURAKIdesign
Defendant
Baby's Toy World Store
Defendant
BrainEBooksShop
Defendant
Bruce Lee Store Store
Defendant
CARAT LIFE Official Store Store
Defendant
ChinaBestProduct Store
Defendant
ChuangYun Home Living Store
Defendant
Chun Store
Defendant
City of sky Store
Defendant
Collection Shijia Store
Defendant
CutieMonsterMarket
Defendant
CyanBlue Store
Defendant
DSXF Store
Defendant
David Fur Store
Defendant
Dongguan Juli Composite Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
EmmaNader
Defendant
Everything was very good Store
Defendant
FJTNB Store
Defendant
FYNDDIQ
Defendant
Feeling Of Home Store
Defendant
Fujian Huian Xinhong Stone Co., Ltd.
Defendant
GDFDBR
Defendant
GE FAN Store
Defendant
Gold Powder Ornaments Store
Defendant
Guangdong Shenglong Toys Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant
HQSA Store
Defendant
HQSB Store
Defendant
HQSC Store
Defendant
Hangzhou Fanshi Home Furnishing Co., Ltd.
Defendant
HarryJakubowski
Defendant
High Quality Sculpture Store
Defendant
Home Furnishings Full Category Store
Defendant
Home-Decoration Store
Defendant
JRLHXJ Store
Defendant
JSC Store
Defendant
JaysonWindler
Defendant
Jiangsu Aurora International Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Jinhua Tomato Healthcare Tech Co., Ltd.
Defendant
JuliaKub
Defendant
Junhui Trading Co., Ltd
Defendant
K-K House Store
Defendant
KingPanda Escape Room TECHNOLOGIES Store
Defendant
LIMITLSCustom
Defendant
LYB Store
Defendant
LYC Store
Defendant
LYD Shop Store
Defendant
Light Luxury Furniture that Hold U Heart Store
Defendant
MBB Store
Defendant
MBC Store
Defendant
MQF Store
Defendant
MS CHOICE Store
Defendant
Minimalism Store
Defendant
Model Car And Building Blocks House Store
Defendant
Morelifeing 001 Store
Defendant
Muzi39;s Shop Store
Defendant
Ningbo Longco Industry And Trade Co., Ltd.
Defendant
No.2 Store
Defendant
Not Late Store
Defendant
Old Boy Store Store
Defendant
OrnamentsThrow Store
Defendant
POP-UP 197 Store
Defendant
Panpan Wall Art Store
Defendant
PrincessLindgren
Defendant
QRIOUROPET
Defendant
QWJB Store
Defendant
Quyang Yiyang Stone Carving Factory
Defendant
Robot Series Toy Store Store
Defendant
RoomWareShop
Defendant
SLDF Shop Store
Defendant
SONGMEN RGB LED Strip Store
Defendant
SONGQUAN ALILI 23 Store
Defendant
SSMMDZ Store
Defendant
Shandong Changsheng Sculpture Art Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shantou Chenghai He Ye Toys Firm
Defendant
Shantou Chenghai Huiyee Toys Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shantou City Moyu Culture Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Baple Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Demeng Toy Design Development Co., Limited
Defendant
Shenzhen Rixi Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shijiazhuang Malton Sculpture Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shop1100346620 Store
Defendant
Shop1102164043 Store
Defendant
Shop1102252526 Store
Defendant
Shop1102342987 Store
Defendant
Shop1102378263 Store
Defendant
Shop1102562809 Store
Defendant
Shop1102721335 Store
Defendant
Shop1102799093 Store
Defendant
Shop1102853936 Store
Defendant
Shop1102861262 Store
Defendant
Shop1102892832 Store
Defendant
Shop1102895410 Store
Defendant
Shop1102926374 Store
Defendant
Shop1102940035 Store
Defendant
Shop1103278255 Store
Defendant
Shop1103311685 Store
Defendant
Shop1103320647 Store
Defendant
Shop1103541250 Store
Defendant
Shop1103607414 Store
Defendant
Shop1103612304 Store
Defendant
Shop1103622930 Store
Defendant
Shop1103672771 Store
Defendant
Shop1103676840 Store
Defendant
Shop1103715609 Store
Defendant
Shop1103724996 Store
Defendant
Shop1103948375 Store
Defendant
Shop1103978185 Store
Defendant
Shop1103980082 Store
Defendant
Shop1103983076 Store
Defendant
Shop1103993569 Store
Defendant
Shop1104049018 Store
Defendant
Shop1104067219 Store
Defendant
Shop1104075338 Store
Defendant
Shop1104078859 Store
Defendant
Shop5080348 Store
Defendant
Shop5253101 Store
Defendant
Storage Brother Store
Defendant
Stroll Life Store
Defendant
Superior Life Store 001 Store
Defendant
Techvunsan Technology Company Store
Defendant
There's a day for you Store
Defendant
ToddGrist
Defendant
Toys R Us Store
Defendant
Vilead Official Store
Defendant
WENZHOU ESHINE INTERNATIONAL TRADE CO.,LTD
Defendant
XGF Store
Defendant
XXTA Store
Defendant
XXTB Store
Defendant
Xiamen KERYON Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Xuanle Big Player Store Store
Defendant
YG&YE Store
Defendant
Yangzhou Amigo Toys Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yangzhou Arl Household Supplies Co.,ltd
Defendant
Yiwu Bobo Toys Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Guanlong Garment Accessories Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Yiwu Shuying E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Your Home Department Store
Defendant
Yuanyuan life Museum Store
Defendant
Zhao Home Life Store
Defendant
Zhejiang Fantong Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Zhengzhou Yeahgo Trade Corporate Limited
Defendant
Zhuhai Baize Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
ZzzzJEr Store
Defendant
anko Store
Defendant
eLADY
Defendant
huangzhimaoyi
Defendant
ijackhafuzr
Defendant
innodept12 Figurine Decoration Store
Defendant
moyudiy
Defendant
nmingleiyixianshangm
Defendant
shenzhenshiyoubianmaoyiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
terashop
Movant
AliExpress E-Commerce One Pte, Ltd.
Represented By
Samuel Blankenship
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Angela L Dunning
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Leila Mgaloblishvili
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Medicom Toy Corporation
Represented By
William Benjamin Kalbac
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
Robert Payton Mcmurray
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
Michael A. Hierl
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd
contact info
John Wilson
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/10/2024 9:08 PM CST
Friday, October 11, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axk, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, )
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Medicom Toy Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22591120.(Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Medicom Toy Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM by Medicom Toy Corporation in support of motion for temporary restraining order,11 (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Akashi Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Declaration Hierl Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3
13 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
19 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Medicom Toy Corporation Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Akashi Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Medicom Toy Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion to seal document7 , motion for temporary restraining order,11 , motion for leave to file excess pages10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/16/2024 at 09:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]