California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:24-cv-07114
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:00 AM PDT
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff
Cynthia Beets
Represented By
John J. Nelson
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 17, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/17 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Cynthia Beets (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/15 1:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Cynthia Beets (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 10/11 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 10/11 10:53 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 10/11 9:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 10/11 9:09 AM
Proposed Summons. (Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19943501.). Filed by Cynthia Beets.(Nelson, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet