Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:24-cv-23936
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause23:1441 Contract Real Estate
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Eugenio Alphandery
Represented By
Erica Gomer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matteo Fossati
10295 Collins Ave Unit 601
Bal Harbour, FL 33154
Represented By
Sebastian Ohanian
The Law Offices Of Sebastian Ohanian, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 05/15 11:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to26 MOTION TO DISMISS25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Matteo Fossati.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 05/02 6:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction25 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Eugenio Alphandery. Responses due by 5/16/2025.(Gomer, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Alphandery Declaration
Friday, April 18, 2025
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Fri 04/18 12:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eugenio Alphandery, filed by Matteo Fossati.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/09 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ildefonso Paul Mas on behalf of Eugenio Alphandery. Attorney Ildefonso Paul Mas added to party Eugenio Alphandery(pty:dft). (Mas, Ildefonso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss Tue 04/08 3:54 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Eugenio Alphandery. Attorney Erica Gomer added to party Eugenio Alphandery(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/22/2025.(Gomer, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service ABROAD/INTERNATIONAL Service Wed 03/26 2:12 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Matteo Fossati. Eugenio Alphandery served on 3/26/2025, response/answer due 4/16/2025.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Translated Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Exhibit Translated POA,
Att: 3 Exhibit Copy of Process,
Att: 4 Exhibit Return Receipt and Tracking
Friday, February 21, 2025
21 21 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 02/21 4:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 20 Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case,,, by Matteo Fossati. (Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
20 20 order Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case Wed 02/19 1:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. This matter comes before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. Rule 4(m)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/19 1:46 PM
Set Deadline per DE#20: Show Cause Response due by 2/24/2025. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
19 19 notice Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Fri 12/20 8:09 AM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re:14 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,7 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,13 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,16 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,10 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,9 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,12 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,18 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,8 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,15 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,17 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati,11 Notice (Other) filed by Matteo Fossati. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:06 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:05 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 7:58 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/20 7:57 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Matteo Fossati (pcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 10/11 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Eugenio Alphandery. (pcs)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 10/11 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Matteo Fossati (Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s) proposed Summons
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Matteo Fossati (Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 10/11 1:20 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (scn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 10/11 1:19 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 12:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Eugenio Alphandery. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17901583, filed by Matteo Fossati.(Ohanian, Sebastian)
Related: [-]