Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Case #: 3:24-cv-30126
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Main Street Hospitality, LLC.
30 Main Street
Stockbridge, MA 01262
Defendant
Race Brook Farms, LLC.
864 S. Undermountain Road
Sheffield, MA 01257
Defendant
Race Brook House Limited Partnership
894 S. Undermountain Road
Sheffield, MA 01257
Defendant
Casey Rothstein-Fitzpatrick
25 Brainard Avenue
Great Barrington, MA 01230
Defendant
Undermountain Hospitality, LLC
864 S. Undermountain Road
Sheffield, MA 01257
Represented By
Michael Stefanilo, Jr.
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Judge Michael Ponsor
Plaintiff
Cora Lee Messina Sharpe
1802 Village Road West
Norwood, MA 02062
Represented By
Peter Beck
Community Legal Aid
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
24 24 order Order Mon 05/12 11:08 AM
Senior District Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re 23 Joint Report to the Court filed by Undermountain Hospitality, LLC. "Construed as a motion for extension of time to submit a final report re: settlement, this is ALLOWED. So ordered." (BAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
23 23 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/08 1:37 PM
NOTICE by Undermountain Hospitality, LLC (Stefanilo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/16 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelin C. Cahill on behalf of Cora Lee Messina Sharpe (Cahill, Michelin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 order Order Fri 03/14 10:21 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re17 Joint Notice/Report to Court. The due date for responsive pleadings is stayed until 21 days after the mediation date.(TRL)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/14 10:16 AM
Senior District Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Motion to Continue Mediation. Allowed. The mediation is continued to April 29, 2025, at 10:00 AM before Senior District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. The mediation will go forward by video conference, and the Clerk's Office will forward the Zoom invitation to counsel. Confidential mediation memoranda shall be submitted by no later than April 22, 2025. (BAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 motion Continue Wed 03/12 2:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Mediation to 4/29/25 by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe, Undermountain Hospitality, LLC.(Stefanilo, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice - Other Wed 03/12 1:30 PM
NOTICE by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe, Undermountain Hospitality, LLC (Stefanilo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 3:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Main Street Hospitality, LLC., Race Brook House Limited Partnership, Casey Rothstein-Fitzpatrick, Undermountain Hospitality, LLC, filed by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe.(Beck, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of ADR Conference Mon 03/10 2:08 PM
Senior Judge Michael A. Ponsor. ORDER with Respect to Mediation ENTERED. Mediation is set for April 9, 2025, at 10:00 AM before Senior District Judge Michael A. Ponsor. The hearing will go forward by video conference. The clerk's office will send a Zoom invite prior to the scheduled mediation. Confidential mediation memoranda shall be submitted by no later than April 2, 2025. (BAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Wed 01/22 10:03 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Michael Ponsor appointed.(MS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/21 11:08 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Motion Referral to Mediation. (TF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/17 2:52 PM
Joint MOTION REFERRAL TO MEDIATION by Undermountain Hospitality, LLC.(Stefanilo, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stefanilo, Jr on behalf of Undermountain Hospitality, LLC (Stefanilo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/06 1:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe. Main Street Hospitality, LLC. waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Beck, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/20 10:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe. Casey Rothstein-Fitzpatrick waiver sent on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Beck, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/20 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe. Undermountain Hospitality, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Beck, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 10/15 1:31 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (TF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other Tue 10/15 12:49 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiff re Service by USMS; LR 4.1. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/15 12:48 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 is GRANTED. The Clerk shall issue summonses for all Defendants. Plaintiff must serve each Defendant with a summons and the complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Service must be completed within 90 days. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, she may ask service to be completed by the United States Marshals Service will all costs to be advanced by the United States. The Clerk shall provide Plaintiff with instructions for service by the USMS. (PSSA, 3)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 10/15 10:19 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Zamorski, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Beck on behalf of Cora Lee Messina Sharpe. (TF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/15 10:12 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe. (TF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Cora Lee Messina Sharpe.(Beck, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs,
Att: 4 Notice of Appearance