California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-01831
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Kelly Ann Reis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Kelly Ann Reis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Defendant
David Radel
Represented By
Kelly Ann Reis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
Muntser Munem Alsalum
Represented By
Julius E Jaboro
Law Offices Of Aziz J Asmar
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 10/24 3:44 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Stay. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 10/24/2024. (stn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
5 5 motion Stay Tue 10/22 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, David Radel. Related [+]Attorney Kelly Ann Reis added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Ann Reis added to party Ur Mendoza Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly Ann Reis added to party David Radel(pty:dft)
Related: [-] is, Kelly
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/22 9:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muntser Munem Alsalum. All Defendants served. (Jaboro, Julius)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
3 3 order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 10/18 2:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. District Judge William Q. Hayes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert S. Huie for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv1831 RSH-KSC.(no document attached) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/11 10:55 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi) (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Fri 10/11 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, David Radel ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19259803.), filed by Muntser Munem Alsalum. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1831-WQH-KSC. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Jaboro, Julius)(axi) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet