North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 5:24-cv-00583
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
TURN TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Plaintiff
ADAM WHITE
Represented By
Suzanne Begnoche
Suzanne Begnoche, Attorney At Law
contact info
Andrew L. Weiner
Weiner & Sand LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/25 10:02 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ADAM WHITE as to Turn Technologies, Inc.. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
utility Case Selected for Mediation Fri 11/01 11:07 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Special Appearance Thu 10/17 4:49 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Andrew L. Weiner on behalf of ADAM WHITE. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
6 6 notice Notice-other Wed 10/16 3:42 PM
Notice filed by ADAM WHITE Civil Cover Sheet . (Begnoche, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/16 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to TURN TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 10/16 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 notice Notice-other Fri 10/11 1:51 PM
Notice filed by ADAM WHITE Summons . (Begnoche, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 10/11 1:46 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by ADAM WHITE (Begnoche, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/11 1:45 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Suzanne Begnoche on behalf of ADAM WHITE. (Begnoche, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7809603.), filed by ADAM WHITE. (Begnoche, Suzanne)
Related: [-]