Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-11212

Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #: 3:24-ap-00060
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
PO Box 3251 601 NW Second Street
Evansville, IN 47731
Represented By
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lindsey L Slatter
421 Seminole Road
Janesville, WI 53546
Represented By
Vicki L. Schleisner
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/07 1:55 PM
Adversary Case Closed (24-60). (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
9 9 orderad Dismissing Case (Adv) Fri 02/14 1:50 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case cc: parties in int. Related [+] Signed on 2/14/2025. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/20 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 batch PM-Order Notice via BNC Wed 12/18 2:57 PM
PM/ORDER Notice via BNC sent to debtor(s) . (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 chap Hearing Held Wed 12/18 10:13 AM
PM/ORDER Pre-trial Conference Held on Complaint. OUTCOME : For the reasons stated from the bench, the adversary proceeding is hereby dismissed for lack of prosecution. (Doc # 1) (Madison, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Summons Thu 10/17 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Summons Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 10/17 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary Pretrial Order Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
3 3 court Preliminary Pretrial Order (auto form) Tue 10/15 2:13 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Order. Signed on 10/15/2024. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto form) Tue 10/15 2:11 PM
Summons to be served by 10/22/2024. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 01:50 PM at Telephone Conference on Compliant . Summons Issued on ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC Answer Due 11/14/2024. Related [+]. (Eau Claire, Janis)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 10:04 AM
Adversary case 3 24-00060 Complaint filed by Lindsey L Slatter against ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC [Receipt Number exempt, Fee Amount $ 350]. Nature of Suit: 12 Related [+] (Schleisner, Vicki)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference