Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Case #: 0:24-cv-61897
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Hypower, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Victor Nelson
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Alejandro David Rodriguez
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff , Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Johnathan Thomas Ayers
Stearns Weaver Miller Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Watson Electrical Construction Co., LLC
Represented By
Matthew Kenneth Stiles
Kenneth Stiles Advisory, PLLC
contact info
Monique Nicole Zapata
Gunster
contact info
Jonathan Kent Osborne
Gunster P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 12/02 11:21 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to keep the case CLOSED, and any pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 12/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 11/27 10:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Watson Electrical Construction Co., LLC(Zapata, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Monday, November 18, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/18 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Johnathan Thomas Ayers on behalf of Hypower, LLC. Attorney Johnathan Thomas Ayers added to party Hypower, LLC(pty:dft). (Ayers, Johnathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 order Administrative Order Thu 11/14 4:23 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All pending deadlines are VACATED. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 11/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 11/14 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to Set/Reset Deadlines, 13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,1 Complaint,, by Hypower, LLC.(Nelson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order EX A - proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 11/07 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Victor Nelson on behalf of Hypower, LLC. Attorney Jeffrey Victor Nelson added to party Hypower, LLC(pty:dft). (Nelson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/05 2:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Defendant, Hypower, LLC f/k/a Hypower, Inc.'s, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed November 4, 2024 [ECF No. 23 (the "Motion")]. THE COURT has considered the Motion and is otherwise fully advised in the premises. Finding good cause for the requested extension and noting that the Motion is unopposed, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint no later than Friday, November 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 11/5/2024. (pg00)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Wed 11/06 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Hypower, LLC response/answer due 11/15/2024. Per DE 13 Order. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/04 8:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Hypower, LLC. Attorney Alejandro David Rodriguez added to party Hypower, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/18/2024.(Rodriguez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EX A - Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 10/28 3:30 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re9 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Party Selected ; ERROR - The filer selected the incorrect party as served. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#10]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 10/28 3:29 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Watson Electrical Construction Co., LLC. Hypower, LLC served on 10/15/2024, response/answer due 11/5/2024. (ls)(See Image at DE #9)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 10/28 8:39 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Watson Electrical Construction Co., LLC. Watson Electrical Construction Co., LLC served on 10/15/2024, response/answer due 11/5/2024.(Zapata, Monique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/22 7:17 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Matthew Kenneth Stiles.. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 10/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
7 7 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Wed 10/16 11:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Monique Nicole Zapata re6 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 10/15 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Monique Nicole Zapata (Zapata, Monique)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Tue 10/15 4:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew Kenneth Stiles. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17907451 by WATSON ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION CO., LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2024.(Osborne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Matthew Kenneth Stiles,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
4 4 misc Bar Letter Tue 10/15 7:59 AM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Matthew K. Stiles, mailing date October 15, 2024, (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/11 4:41 PM
Summons Issued as to HYPOWER, LLC f/k/a HYPOWER, INC.. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 10/11 4:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against HYPOWER, LLC f/k/a HYPOWER, INC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17902475, filed by WATSON ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION CO., LLC.(Osborne, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons directed to Defendant, Hypower, LLC f_k_a Hypower, Inc,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Blanket Subcontract,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Prime Contract,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Electrical Subcontract (1-5),
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Final Electrical Invoice