Connecticut District Court
Judge:Thomas O Farrish
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:24-cv-01634
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:0405dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
21 21 order Judgment Tue 03/11 2:28 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Suehala Abdelaziz against Martin J. O'Malley. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/11/25.(Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Tue 03/11 12:46 PM
ORDER granting on consent the Commissioner's19 Motion for Entry of Judgment Under Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with Reversal and Remand of the Cause to the Defendant. The parties agree that additional administrative action is warranted. This is not a Recommended Ruling. The parties have consented to a Magistrate Judge entering a final order in this case without the need for entry of a recommended ruling and review by a District Judge. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b). The Clerk is directed to enter a separate judgment in favor of Plaintiff in this matter under Rule 58(a), Fed. R. Civ. P., to remand this case to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings in accordance with this Order, and to close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 3/11/25. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Tue 03/11 2:32 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 motion Remand to Agency Fri 03/07 1:31 PM
MOTION to Remand to Agency by Martin J. O'Malley. (Molinaro, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 02/06 11:06 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 3/12/2025. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 2/6/25. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 02/05 2:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Remand to Agency until Mar. 12, 2025 by Martin J. O'Malley. (Molinaro, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Thu 01/02 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Molinaro appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number (Paperless filing) (Molinaro, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
15 15 motion Remand to Agency Wed 01/01 9:09 PM
MOTION to Remand to Agency by Suehala Abdelaziz.(Spat, Meryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/17 10:01 AM
NOTICE by Social Security Administration of filing of Unofficial Text-searchable Copy of Certified Administrative Record(Sertial, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record
Monday, December 16, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/16 11:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. The Government having filed the administrative record on December 11, 2024, the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than January 10, 2025. Defendant shall then have until February 10, 2025 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 12/16/24.(Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 answer Social Security Transcripts Wed 12/11 5:08 PM
Social Security Transcripts. (Sertial, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
11 11 misc Consent and Transfer to Jurisdiction by USMJ Wed 10/16 12:31 PM
Consent and Transfer to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/16/2024.(Nuzzi, T)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice SSA Cases - Notice of New Action Wed 10/16 10:59 AM
Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/15 1:57 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. Plaintiff has fully completed the required information. She asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(1). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court has also reviewed the Complaint, ECF No. 1, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and finds the claim is sufficient to proceed to service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 10/15/2024. (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Tue 10/15 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Sertial appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number (Paperless filing) (Sertial, Heather)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
9 9 intord SSA Cases - Notice to Counsel Wed 10/16 10:55 AM
Notice to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 10/16 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/11/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
7 7 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order Wed 10/16 10:54 AM
Standing Order re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/11/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
6 6 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment Wed 10/16 10:53 AM
Standing Order regarding Assignment of Appeals of Social Security Administration Decisions. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 10/11/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/11 4:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Suehala Abdelaziz. (Spat, Meryl)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 10/11 4:48 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Suehala Abdelaziz (Spat, Meryl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley, filed by Suehala Abdelaziz.(Spat, Meryl)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/15 9:02 AM
Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. Motions referred to Maria E. Garcia (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 10/16 10:56 AM
Answer deadline updated for Martin J. O'Malley to 12/11/2024. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]