Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-01807
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1973 National Voter Registration Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Commonwealth of Virginia
Office of the Attorney General 202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Thomas John Sanford
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Virginia State Board of Elections
Virginia State Board of Elections Washington Building 1100 Bank Street, First Floor
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Thomas John Sanford
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Susan Beals
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Thomas John Sanford
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Department of Justice, Civil Rights Division, Voting Section
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W, DC 20530
Represented By
Kevin Paul Muench
Doj-Crt
contact info
Brian Remlinger
Doj-Crt
contact info
Sejal Jhaveri
Doj-Crt
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/18 1:17 PM
ORDER that Virginia Coalition for Immigrant Rights, et al, v. Susan Beals, et al. Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-1778, and United States of America v. Commonwealth of Virginia, et al., Civil Action No. 1:24-cv-1807, are consolidated; Virginia Coalition for Immigrant Rights, et al, v. Susan Beals, et al, Civil Action No. l:24-cv-1778 is designated as the lead case. Documents should bear both case numbers and need only be filed in the lead case (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/18/24. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Paul Muench on behalf of United States of America (Muench, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/18 10:29 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's in both cases shall file their respective oppositions to the Motions to Transfer Venue (Civil Action No. l:24-cv-1778, Dkt. 46; Civil Action No. l:24-cv- 1807, Dkt. 11) no later than 9:00 a.m. on Monday October 21, 2024. Thereafter, the Court will decide the motion on the papers; and it is further ORDERED that the Court will tentatively set the hearing on the United States Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 9) on Thursday, October 24, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (See Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/18/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/18 11:58 AM
Set Deadline as to9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 10/18 1:20 PM
ALL DOCUMENTS FROM THIS DATE FORWARD TO BE DOCKETED IN THE LEAD CASE 1:24-cv-1778 (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (other) Thu 10/17 1:57 PM
NOTICE by Susan Beals, Commonwealth of Virginia, Virginia State Board of Elections re11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Richmond Division Waiver of Oral Argument and Request for Expedited Briefing (Sanford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 8 pgs respoth Brief in Support Thu 10/17 1:50 PM
Brief in Support to11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Richmond Division filed by Susan Beals, Commonwealth of Virginia, Virginia State Board of Elections. (Sanford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Transfer Case Thu 10/17 1:46 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to Richmond Division by Susan Beals, Commonwealth of Virginia, Virginia State Board of Elections. (Sanford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 10/16 10:41 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 10/16 10:39 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-GREB Handbook Ch. 6,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Executive Order 35,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-Eric Olsen Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-Voter Registration List Maintenance Standard Operating Procedures,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5-Connolly Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6-Hopper Processing and Information,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7-Notice of Intent to Cancel,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8-Voter Registration Cancellation Notice,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9-Recording of House Privileges and Elections Comm (Sept. 4, 2024),
Att: 11 Exhibit 10-Beals Letter,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11-Recording of Loudoun County Electoral Board (Sept. 12, 2024),
Att: 13 Exhibit 12-Loudoun County Electoral Board Meeting Agenda (Oct 10, 2024),
Att: 14 Exhibit 13-Fairfax County General Registrars Report,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14-Recording of Prince William County Electoral Board (Sept.30, 2024),
Att: 16 Exhibit 15-Washington Post article,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16-DOJ Letter,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17-Virginia Voter Registration Application,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18-Press release re prosecution of non-citizen voter in Alabama,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19-Journal article re non-citizen voting,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20-PI Order in Alabama litigation,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21-GREB Handbook Ch. 7,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22-AL PI Hearing Transcript,
Att: 24 Proposed Order
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Susan Beals served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024; Commonwealth of Virginia served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024; Virginia State Board of Elections served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 2:26 PM
ORDERED that the parties in the above referenced cases are directed to notify the Court no later than noon on Friday, October 18, 2024, for any reason why these cases should not be consolidated. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 10/16/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/15 1:07 PM
Case reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/15 1:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Susan Beals, Commonwealth of Virginia, Virginia State Board of Elections, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Cwel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Sat 10/12 7:28 PM
Proposed Summons for Commissioner Beals by United States of America (Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Sat 10/12 7:27 PM
Proposed Summons for the Virginia State Board of Elections by United States of America (Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Sat 10/12 7:25 PM
Proposed Summons for the Commonwealth of Virginia by United States of America (Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/11 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Remlinger on behalf of United States of America Related [+]
Related: [-] mlinger, Brian
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/11 5:03 PM
Complaint , filed by United States of America.(Jhaveri, Sejal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Intent to Cancel,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Voter Registration Cancellation Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Beals Notice,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 10/15 1:32 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Cwel)
Related: [-]