Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Referred: Hector L Ramos-Vega
Case #: 3:24-cv-01474
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:18 AM AST
Defendant
Tomas Niembro-Concha
Represented By
Javier Micheo-Marcial
Dmr Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Nodus International Bank Inc.
Represented By
Jose Enrique Nassar-Veglio
contact info
Gorman A. Hatcher-Santaella
Pirillo Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Juan Ramirez-Silva
Represented By
Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Estrella, LLC
contact info
Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Estrella, LLC
contact info
Alberto G. Estrella
Estrella, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Morella Rincon
Defendant
Maria Gabriela Vazquez
Plaintiff
Consorcio SG Investment Group
Represented By
Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
88 88 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/14 3:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Surreply to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Consorcio SG Investment Group Re:85 Reply to Motion filed by Tomas Niembro-Concha filed by Consorcio SG Investment Group. (Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
87 87 respm Reply to Motion Mon 05/12 7:11 PM
REPLY to Motion Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Stay filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva Re:72 Joint MOTION to Stay Tomas Niembro-Concha and Juan Ramirez's Motion to Stay filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
86 86 respm Reply to Motion Mon 05/12 3:07 PM
REPLY to Motion Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva Re:50 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
85 85 respm Reply to Motion Fri 05/09 4:26 PM
REPLY to Motion filed by Tomas Niembro-Concha Re:59 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tomas Niembro-Concha filed by Tomas Niembro-Concha. (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
84 84 respm Response to Motion Thu 05/08 4:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion in Opposition to Defendants Tomas Niembro Concha & Juan Ramirezs Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Resolution of Parallel Criminal Action filed by Consorcio SG Investment Group Re:72 Joint MOTION to Stay Tomas Niembro-Concha and Juan Ramirez's Motion to Stay filed by Juan Ramirez-Silva filed by Consorcio SG Investment Group. (Emmanuelli-Jimenez, Rolando)
Related: [-]
83 83 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/08 8:22 AM
ORDER granting:82 "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply." Response due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 5/8/2025. (ao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
82 82 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/07 4:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 9, 2025 to File Response/Reply as to71 Reply to Motion, filed by Consorcio SG Investment Group filed by Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Tomas Niembro-Concha. Responses due by 5/21/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Munoz, Julian)
Related: [-] 71