Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00978
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 5:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By
C Charles Townsend
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Bryan Timothy Brown
Hinshaw Culbertson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roderick Venture
Represented By
Adolfo Vasquez
Adolfo Vasquez Law
contact info
Derrick J Rodriguez
Derrick Rodriguez Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 12/11 5:21 AM
Unopposed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Brown, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 12/11 11:04 AM
Civil Case Terminated Per Stipulation of Dismissal8 . (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 12/10 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derrick J Rodriguez on behalf of Roderick Venture. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rodriguez, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 11/13 3:50 PM
ORDER: the parties are DIRECTED to file the appropriate settlement papersa stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with corresponding proposed order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2)no later than December 13, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/13/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 11/13 3:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Nov 13 15:50:45 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/12 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Townsend, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
4 4 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Wed 10/16 1:04 PM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/16/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 10/16 1:05 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Oct 16 13:05:22 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
misc Order Receipt Tue 10/15 11:27 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Tue Oct 15 11:27:30 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Tue 10/15 11:26 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 10/11 4:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Brown, Bryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/11 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14986682) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 8